Jones et al v. ACS/ Queens Field office et al
Plaintiff: Alysia Davina Jones and Pierre Merlin Kamtchi
Defendant: ACS/ Queens Field office and Alethea Stowe
Case Number: 1:2023cv05742
Filed: July 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: Eric R Komitee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT FILING, litigant notified of deficiency(s) that must be corrected within fourteen (14) days. (GA)
July 30, 2023 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (KD)
July 30, 2023 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:23-cv-06166. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 7/30/2023 (KD).
July 21, 2023 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 3. Mailed to: Alysia Davina Jones 153-04 75th Ave. Queens, NY 11367. (sha) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/30/2023.]
July 19, 2023 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of New York.(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/30/2023.]
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. Whether Plaintiffs should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/19/23) (rdz) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/30/2023.] .
July 19, 2023 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/30/2023.]
July 17, 2023 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis See document #2 by Alysia Davina Jones. (KD)
July 17, 2023 Filing 2 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Alysia Davina Jones..(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/30/2023.]
July 17, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/30/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. ACS/ Queens Field office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alysia Davina Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pierre Merlin Kamtchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACS/ Queens Field office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alethea Stowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?