Stevens v. Tomlin
Plaintiff: Andrew Stevens
Defendant: Mattson Tomlin
Case Number: 1:2023cv05898
Filed: July 31, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: Pamela K Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Court grants Plaintiff's #6 motion for extension of time to file a second amended complaint. Plaintiff's deadline to file a second amended complaint is extended to 11/2/2023. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 9/19/2023. (LC)
September 15, 2023 Filing 6 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #4 Amended Complaint by Andrew Stevens. (ML)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Court grants Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. However, for the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum and Order, Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). In light of Plaintiff's pro se status, the Court gives Plaintiff 30 days from the date of this Order to file a second amended complaint. All further proceedings shall be stayed for 30 days. If Plaintiff does not file a second amended complaint within the time allowed or show good cause why he cannot comply, the Court shall direct the Clerk of Court to enter judgment and close this case. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this Memorandum and Order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 8/24/2023. (LC)
August 15, 2023 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mattson Tomlin, filed by Andrew Stevens. (ML)
August 4, 2023 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (KD)
August 4, 2023 Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information: re dkt. entry 4; document removed as it was inadvertently filed in the wrong action. (ML)
July 31, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andrew Stevens. (KD)
July 31, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mattson Tomlin, filed by Andrew Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevens v. Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mattson Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?