Kaneka Corporation v. Cocrystal Technology (Jiaxing) Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Kaneka Corporation
Defendant: Cocrystal Technology (Jiaxing) Co., Ltd., Shanghai Cocrystal Pharmaceutical Technology Co., Ltd. and Cocrystal Health Industry (Zhejiang) Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2023cv07483
Filed: October 5, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: Diane Gujarati
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Cocrystal Health Industry (Zhejiang) Co., Ltd., Cocrystal Technology (Jiaxing) Co., Ltd.. (IH)
November 16, 2023 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. Re #5 Amended Complaint,, by Kaneka Corporation (Griffin, Gerald)
November 16, 2023 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. Re #5 Amended Complaint,, by Kaneka Corporation (Griffin, Gerald)
November 16, 2023 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Cocrystal Health Industry (Zhejiang) Co., Ltd., Cocrystal Technology (Jiaxing) Co., Ltd., filed by Kaneka Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US7829080, #2 Exhibit B - Specification of July 2022 Cocrystal Ubiquinol to Tishcon, #3 Exhibit C - Analysis of July 2022 Ubiquinol from Cocrystal to Tishcon, #4 Exhibit D -Innovative Ingredients Coenzyme QH Slide Deck, #5 Exhibit E - Kaneka Test of Cocrystal Ubiquinol Oct 2022, #6 Exhibit F - Cocrystal Actives Brochure, #7 Exhibit G - CoCrystal Letter of Indemnity, #8 Exhibit H - Crystal QH Results, #9 Exhibit I - NutraIngredients Advertisement) (Griffin, Gerald)
October 10, 2023 Filing 4 Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 patent registration) (RC)
October 10, 2023 Case Reassigned to Judge Diane Gujarati. Judge Allyne R. Ross no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)
October 9, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cocrystal Health Industry (Zhejiang) Co., Ltd., Cocrystal Technology (Jiaxing) Co., Ltd.. (KD)
October 9, 2023 Filing 2 Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link: #https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf (KD)
October 9, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)
October 5, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cocrystal Health Industry (Zhejiang) Co., Ltd., Cocrystal Technology (Jiaxing) Co., Ltd. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-17155853 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Kaneka Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US7829080, #2 Exhibit B - Specification of July 2022 Cocrystal Ubiquinol to Tishcon, #3 Exhibit C - Analysis of July 2022 Ubiquinol from Cocrystal to Tishcon, #4 Exhibit D - Innovative Ingredients Coenzyme QH Slide Deck, #5 Exhibit E - Kaneka Test of Cocrystal Ubiquinol Oct 2022, #6 Exhibit F - Cocrystal Actives Brochure, #7 Exhibit G - CoCrystal Letter of Indemnity, #8 Exhibit H - Crystal QH Results, #9 Exhibit I - NutraIngredients Advertisement, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Proposed Summons) (Griffin, Gerald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaneka Corporation v. Cocrystal Technology (Jiaxing) Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cocrystal Technology (Jiaxing) Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shanghai Cocrystal Pharmaceutical Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cocrystal Health Industry (Zhejiang) Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaneka Corporation
Represented By: Gerald William Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?