Shenzhen City Sanhu Technology Co., Ltd. v. Albanese et al
Plaintiff: Shenzhen City Sanhu Technology Co., Ltd.
Defendant: Lindsay Albanese, Hats On LLC and Hats On LLC doing business as TopTote
Case Number: 1:2023cv07691
Filed: October 16, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Case transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA as case 8:23-cv-02047, filed 11/01/2023. (TLH)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER, and Case transferred to District of Central District of California. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE.. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/30/2023 ) (RG)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Shenzhen City Sanhu Technology Co., Ltd. (Zhang, Jiyuan)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Lindsay Albanese, Hats On LLC. (RG)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Proposed Summons. by Shenzhen City Sanhu Technology Co., Ltd. (Zhang, Jiyuan)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link: #https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf (KD)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: No name and address on the Plaintiffs attorney name and addresses section. Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (KD)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by 10/25/23 why this case should not be dismissed or transferred for improper venue. Other than the location of the office of plaintiff's counsel, this case appears to have no connection with the Eastern District of New York. The complaint alleges venue is proper here "because a substantial part of the events giving rise to the claims occurred in this district," but defendant's sales into New York have nothing to do with plaintiff's complaint. Plaintiff's complaint, rather, alleges defendant's misconduct is contacting Amazon to claim that plaintiff is infringing. That contact between defendant and Amazon occurred in California, where defendant has its business, not in New York. California is thus the venue where "a substantial part of the events giving rise to the claims occurred," not the Eastern District of New York. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/17/2023. (PW)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for AO 120 Report re Patent served on Jiyuan Zhang on 10/16/2023, filed by Shenzhen City Sanhu Technology Co., Ltd.. (Zhang, Jiyuan)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,, by Shenzhen City Sanhu Technology Co., Ltd. (Zhang, Jiyuan)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shenzhen City Sanhu Technology Co., Ltd. (Zhang, Jiyuan)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lindsay Albanese, Hats On LLC filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-17184809 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Shenzhen City Sanhu Technology Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1. 047 Patent, #3 Exhibit 2. Complaint dated 05102023, #4 Exhibit 3. Complaint dated 09282023, #5 Exhibit 4. Product for sale, #6 Exhibit 5. Non-infringement analysis, #7 Exhibit 6. Amazon's email dated 06132023) (Zhang, Jiyuan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shenzhen City Sanhu Technology Co., Ltd. v. Albanese et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shenzhen City Sanhu Technology Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Jiyuan Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsay Albanese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hats On LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hats On LLC doing business as TopTote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?