Reid v. The Sygma Network, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Henry A. Reid Jr
Defendant: The Sygma Network, Inc. and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2023cv08778
Filed: November 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order CONSENT NOTICE: This case was directly assigned to Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak pursuant to a #Pilot Program governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. Under the rules set forth in that Administrative Order, the parties' deadline to fully consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction is 02/19/2024; otherwise, a district judge will be assigned to this case at random. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 1/19/2024. (DB)
January 19, 2024 MINUTE ENTRY for Initial Conference proceeding held before Magistrate Judge Cheryl Pollak on 1/18/2024. Appearance for Plaintiff: Joseph Medic (no notice of appearance filed - COUNSEL MUST FILE A NOTICE OF APPEARANCE). Appearance for Defendants: Joseph Denis Fanning. Defendant is to re-serve document requests and interrogatories with federal court caption - responses due in 30 days. Plaintiff to serve discovery requests in 30 days - responses due 30 days thereafter. Parties to depose the plaintiff and def driver by May 1, 2024. Status Conference set for 5/2/2024 @ 10:15 AM. Conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 10:15 AM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 23-8778. (DC)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 1/18/2024 @ 10:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Initial conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 10:45 AM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 23-8778. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 12/1/2023. (DC)
November 30, 2023 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Henry A. Reid Jr (Pager, William)
November 30, 2023 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (AF)
November 30, 2023 Filing 5 Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here: #https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website: #https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program. (AF)
November 30, 2023 This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (AF)
November 30, 2023 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (AF)
November 29, 2023 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Joseph Denis Fanning on behalf of The Sygma Network, Inc. (Fanning, Joseph)
November 29, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE by The Sygma Network, Inc. re #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal,, (Fanning, Joseph)
November 29, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Sygma Network, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sysco Corporation for The Sygma Network, Inc.. (Fanning, Joseph)
November 29, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Sygma Network, Inc. from KINGS COUNTY SUPREME COURT, case number 511395/2023. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-17327972) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A - FILED SUMMONS & COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO SYGMA, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT C - SYGMA STIPULATION, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT D - NYSCEF DOCKET SHEET, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT E - FILED ANSWER WITH CONFIRMATION NOTICE, #6 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET) (Fanning, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reid v. The Sygma Network, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry A. Reid Jr
Represented By: William Pager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sygma Network, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Denis Fanning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?