Estate of Richard Johnson et al v. Alight Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Richard Johnson and James Johnson
Defendant: Alight Solutions, LLC, Metlife Services and Solutions, LLC, The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation and Cynthia Dade
Case Number: 1:2024cv02106
Filed: March 22, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Natasha C Merle
Referring Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2024 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER: In light of #20 , the initial conference previously scheduled for 5/30/2024 before Magistrate Judge Cheryl Pollak is adjourned sine die. A stipulation of dismissal is to be filed within 30 days - 6/10/2024. Plaintiff to file a status report regarding Cynthia Dade by 6/10/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 5/10/2024. (DC)
May 9, 2024 Filing 20 Letter From Randi F. Knepper, Esq. advising that a Settlement has been reached against all Defendants except Cynthia Dade by Metlife Services and Solutions, LLC (Knepper, Randi)
April 26, 2024 Filing 19 Letter from Randi F. Knepper, Esq. Requesting an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint through May 13, 2024 by Metlife Services and Solutions, LLC (Knepper, Randi)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER TO ANSWER re #19 Request granted. Answer due 5/13/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 4/26/2024. (DC)
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 5/30/2024 @ 12:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Initial conference will proceed via CISCO conference call. Please dial 571-353-2301 at 12:45 PM. Enter Meeting ID: 022-788-537. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 4/19/2024. (DC)
April 17, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Emma Jane O'Connor on behalf of Alight Solutions, LLC (notification declined or already on case) (O'Connor, Emma)
April 17, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Torres on behalf of Alight Solutions, LLC (notification declined or already on case) (Torres, Joseph)
April 16, 2024 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #11 - #12 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorneys shall register for ECF; registration is available online at the NYED's homepage. Once registered, the attorneys shall file notices of appearance and ensure that they receive electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorneys shall ensure that the $200 admission fee is or has been submitted to the Clerk's Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 4/16/2024. (DB)
April 15, 2024 Filing 15 Defendant Alight Solutions LLC's Amended ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Alight Solutions, LLC. (Ross, Jenna)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER re #10 - #13 : Defendants DTCC and MetLife shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 04/29/2024. Plaintiffs shall respond to defendants' request for consolidation by 04/05/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 3/29/2024. (DB)
March 28, 2024 Filing 14 Defendant Alight Solutions LLC's ANSWER to Complaint by Alight Solutions, LLC. (Ross, Jenna)
March 28, 2024 Filing 13 Letter Regarding Request for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and Consolidation of Two Cases by The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation (Girshon, Todd)
March 28, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Alight Solutions LLC Filing fee $ 200, receipt number ANYEDC-17716433 by Alight Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Certificate of Good Standing (IL)) (O'Connor, Emma)
March 28, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Alight Solutions LLC Filing fee $ 200, receipt number ANYEDC-17716396 by Alight Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Certificate of Good Standing (IL)) (Torres, Joseph)
March 27, 2024 Filing 10 Letter from Randi F. Knepper, Esq. Requesting an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint Through April 29, 2024 by Metlife Services and Solutions, LLC (Knepper, Randi)
March 27, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Randi Knepper on behalf of Metlife Services and Solutions, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Knepper, Randi)
March 27, 2024 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alight Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Alight, Inc. for Alight Solutions, LLC. (Ross, Jenna)
March 27, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna Elizabeth Ross on behalf of Alight Solutions, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Ross, Jenna)
March 22, 2024 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SDM)
March 22, 2024 Filing 5 Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link: #https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf (SDM)
March 22, 2024 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Estate of Richard Johnson, James Johnson (SDM)
March 22, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin W. Murray on behalf of The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Murray, Kevin) Modified on 3/22/2024 (SDM).
March 22, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation (Girshon, Todd) Modified on 3/22/2024 (SDM).
March 22, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Richmond, case number 150195/2024. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANYEDC-17696447) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Delivery, #3 Exhibit C - Pleadings, #4 Exhibit D - Index) (Girshon, Todd)
March 22, 2024 This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (SDM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Richard Johnson et al v. Alight Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Richard Johnson
Represented By: Jeffrey F. P. Borrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Johnson
Represented By: Jeffrey F. P. Borrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alight Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Torres
Represented By: Jenna Elizabeth Ross
Represented By: Emma Jane O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metlife Services and Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Randi Knepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation
Represented By: Todd H. Girshon
Represented By: Kevin W. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Dade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?