Riccio v. RB Health (US) LLC
Plaintiff: Rose Riccio
Defendant: Reckitt Benckiser Pharmaceuticals Inc. and RB Health (US) LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv03136
Filed: April 29, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2024 Filing 26 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:23-cv-13879. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 30, 2024 The case of Riccio v. RB Health (US) LLC, has been transferred from Northern District of Illinois to the Eastern District of New York. The new case number is 24-cv-3136. PLEASE NOTE: if you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (AF)
April 29, 2024 Filing 25 TRANSFERRED to the Eastern District of New York the electronic record. (jj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 4/30/2024.]
April 26, 2024 Filing 24 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to Eastern District of New York. Mailed notice. (jj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 4/30/2024.]
April 26, 2024 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 3089 Conditional Transfer Order filed 4/26/2024. (jj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 4/30/2024.]
April 26, 2024 Filing 23 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Rose Riccio Exhibit A to Joint Status Report regarding status report #22 (Ruben, Erin) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 4/30/2024.]
April 26, 2024 Filing 22 STATUS Report Joint by Rose Riccio (Ruben, Erin) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 4/30/2024.]
April 15, 2024 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: This case has been reassigned to the calendar of Judge Sunil R. Harjani. The parties shall file a joint status report by 4/26/2024. A telephone status hearing is set for 5/2/2024 at 9:15 a.m. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing but will be placed on mute. The call-in number is (855) 244-8681 and the access code is 172 628 1276#. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Mailed notice (lxs, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 4/30/2024.]
April 3, 2024 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Joint status report date of 4/26/24 is vacated. Mailed notice (maf) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 4/30/2024.]
April 3, 2024 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Telephone Conference set for 5/2/24 is vacated. Mailed notice (maf) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 4/30/2024.]
April 2, 2024 Filing 18 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: GENERAL ORDER 24-0008: IT APPEARING THAT, the civil cases on the attached list have been selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani; therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached list of 290 cases be reassigned to the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all parties affected by this Order must review the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani's webpage on the Court's website for the purpose of reviewing instructions regarding scheduling and case management procedures; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any civil case that has been reassigned pursuant to this Order will not be randomly reassigned to create the initial calendar of a new district judge for twelve months from the date of this Order; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani to the Court's civil case assignment system during the next business day, so that he shall receive a full share of such cases; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani to the Court's criminal case assignment system ninety (90) days so that Judge Harjani shall thereafter receive a full share of such cases. Case reassigned to the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani for all further proceedings. Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/02/2024.(tg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 4/30/2024.]
March 19, 2024 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Telephone Conference set for 3/26/24 is re-set to 5/2/24 at 9:00 a.m. Joint status report shall be filed by 4/26/24. Dial: 888-684-8852 or 215-446-0155, access code: 9582710#. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (maf) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 4/30/2024.]
March 12, 2024 Filing 16 STIPULATION to Stay Action Pending Decision from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Suciu, Nick) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 4/30/2024.]
January 9, 2024 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rose Riccio by Russell Busch (Busch, Russell) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 4/30/2024.]
December 28, 2023 Filing 14 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/28/2023: Mailed notice. (tg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 4/30/2024.]
November 15, 2023 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Telephone Conference set for 11/29/23 is re-set to 3/26/24 at 9:00 a.m. Joint status report shall be filed by 3/18/24. Dial: 888-684-8852 or 215-446-0155, access code: 9582710#. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. STIPULATION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY NAME, AMEND CAPTION, AND STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING MDL DETERMINATION is granted. Mailed notice (maf) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 4/30/2024.]
October 26, 2023 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rose Riccio by Jeffrey M. Ostrow (Ostrow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 4/30/2024.]
October 19, 2023 Filing 11 AMENDED complaint by Rose Riccio against RB Health (US) LLC and terminating Reckitt Benckiser Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Klinger, Gary) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 4/30/2024.]
October 19, 2023 Filing 10 STIPULATION Stipulation to Substitute Party Name Amend Caption and Stay Proceedings Pending MDL Determination (Klinger, Gary) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 4/30/2024.]
October 18, 2023 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Telephone Conference set for 11/29/23 at 9:15 a.m. Joint status report shall be filed by 11/21/23. Dial: 888-684-8852 or 215-446-0155, access code: 9582710#. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (maf) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 4/30/2024.]
October 5, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rose Riccio as to Reckitt Benckiser Pharmaceuticals Inc. on 9/28/2023, answer due 10/19/2023. (Klinger, Gary) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 4/30/2024.]
September 21, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Reckitt Benckiser Pharmaceuticals Inc. (mek,) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 4/30/2024.]
September 20, 2023 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rose Riccio by Ryan Thomas Gott (Gott, Ryan) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 4/30/2024.]
September 20, 2023 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rose Riccio by Melissa Susan Weiner (Weiner, Melissa) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 4/30/2024.]
September 20, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (smb, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 4/30/2024.]
September 20, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (smb, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 4/30/2024.]
September 19, 2023 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rose Riccio by John Hunter Bryson (Bryson, John) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 4/30/2024.]
September 19, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rose Riccio by Erin J. Ruben (Ruben, Erin) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 4/30/2024.]
September 19, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rose Riccio by Nick Suciu, III (Suciu, Nick) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 4/30/2024.]
September 19, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Klinger, Gary) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 4/30/2024.]
September 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Rose Riccio; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21104728.(Klinger, Gary) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 4/30/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riccio v. RB Health (US) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Riccio
Represented By: Erin J. Ruben
Represented By: Jeff Ostrow
Represented By: John Hunter Bryson
Represented By: Nick Suciu, III
Represented By: Russell Busch
Represented By: Melissa Susan Weiner
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Gott
Represented By: Gary M. Klinger
Represented By: Nick Suciu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reckitt Benckiser Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RB Health (US) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?