Kang v. USCIS Office of the General Counsel et al
Plaintiff: Changfang Kang
Defendant: USCIS Office of the General Counsel, USCIS Attorney General of the USA and United States Attorney for the Eastern District of New York Office of the United States Attorney
Case Number: 1:2024cv03176
Filed: April 29, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nina R Morrison
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1651 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Changfang Kang. USCIS Attorney General of the USA served on 5/6/2024, answer due 7/5/2024; USCIS Office of the General Counsel served on 5/6/2024, answer due 7/5/2024; United States Attorney for the Eastern District of New York Office of the United States Attorney served on 5/6/2024, answer due 7/5/2024. (SG)
May 7, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Megaris on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Megaris, Alexandra)
April 29, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to USCIS Attorney General of the USA, USCIS Office of the General Counsel, United States Attorney for the Eastern District of New York Office of the United States Attorney. (SDM)
April 29, 2024 Filing 2 FILING FEE: $ 405.00, receipt number 100014115 (SDM)
April 29, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against USCIS Attorney General of the USA, USCIS Office of the General Counsel, United States Attorney for the Eastern District of New York Office of the United States Attorney, filed by Changfang Kang. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (SDM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kang v. USCIS Office of the General Counsel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Changfang Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS Office of the General Counsel
Represented By: Alexandra Megaris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS Attorney General of the USA
Represented By: Alexandra Megaris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney for the Eastern District of New York Office of the United States Attorney
Represented By: Alexandra Megaris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?