Liu v. USCIS Office of the General Counsel et al
Plaintiff: Penghui Liu
Defendant: USCIS Office of the General Counsel, USCIS Attorney General of the USA and United States Attorney for the Eastern District of New York Office of the United States Attorney
Case Number: 1:2024cv03177
Filed: April 29, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Pamela K Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The United States Attorney, as attorney for Defendants, is directed to show cause on or before 7/18/2024, in writing, why a writ of mandamus should not be issued, and shall serve a copy of the response on Plaintiff, with proof of such service to the Clerk of this Court. On or before 8/19/2024, Plaintiff shall file a reply, if any, with proof of service to the Clerk of Court. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 5/19/2024. Electronic Service upon the US Attorneys Office re #1 Complaint, filed by Penghui Liu. (FG)
May 15, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Penghui Liu. USCIS Attorney General of the USA served on 5/6/2024, answer due 7/5/2024; USCIS Office of the General Counsel served on 5/6/2024, answer due 7/5/2024; United States Attorney for the Eastern District of New York Office of the United States Attorney served on 5/6/2024, answer due 7/5/2024. (SG) (Main Document 6 replaced on 5/20/2024) (SG). (Main Document 6 replaced on 5/20/2024) (SG).
May 7, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole M. Zito on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Zito, Nicole)
May 2, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to USCIS Attorney General of the USA, USCIS Office of the General Counsel, United States Attorney for the Eastern District of New York Office of the United States Attorney, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (CV)
May 2, 2024 Filing 2 FILING FEE: $ 405.00, receipt number 100014116 (CV)
May 2, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against USCIS Attorney General of the USA, USCIS Office of the General Counsel, United States Attorney for the Eastern District of New York Office of the United States Attorney, filed by Penghui Liu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (CV)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liu v. USCIS Office of the General Counsel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penghui Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS Office of the General Counsel
Represented By: Nicole M. Zito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS Attorney General of the USA
Represented By: Nicole M. Zito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney for the Eastern District of New York Office of the United States Attorney
Represented By: Nicole M. Zito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?