Nowakowski v. AXT, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Craig Nowakowski
Defendant: AXT, Inc., Morris S. Young and Gary L. Fischer
Case Number: 1:2024cv03341
Filed: May 6, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: James R Cho
Referring Judge: Dora Lizette Irizarry
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2024 Case transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:24-cv-02778, filed 05/09/2024. (TLH)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA --- On May 7, 2024, the parties jointly submitted a stipulation and proposed order for the transfer of this case to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California. See, Dkt. Entry No. #7 . "For the convenience of parties and witnesses, in the interest of justice, a district court may transfer any civil action to any other district or division where it might have been brought or to any district or division to which all parties have consented." 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1404(a). The parties stipulate that this action might have been brought in the Northern District of California, and they have consented to the transfer. Accordingly, this action is TRANSFERRED pursuant to 28 USC Section 1404(a) to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. SO ORDERED by Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 5/8/2024. (CC)
May 8, 2024 Case transferred electronically via ECF/PACER to the District of California-ND pursuant to Electronic Order dtd. 5/8/2024. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (MLR)
May 7, 2024 Filing 7 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Transfer Action Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by AXT, Inc., Gary L. Fischer, Morris S. Young (Leong, Eunice)
May 7, 2024 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AXT, Inc. (Leong, Eunice)
May 7, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Eunice Leong on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Leong, Eunice)
May 6, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to AXT, Inc., Gary L. Fischer, Morris S. Young. (KD)
May 6, 2024 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
May 6, 2024 Filing 2 Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link: #https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf (KD)
May 6, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AXT, Inc., Gary L. Fischer, Morris S. Young filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-17844732 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Craig Nowakowski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PSLRA Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons) (Kim, Phillip)
May 6, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry and Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nowakowski v. AXT, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Nowakowski
Represented By: Phillip Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AXT, Inc.
Represented By: Eunice Leong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris S. Young
Represented By: Eunice Leong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary L. Fischer
Represented By: Eunice Leong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?