Andrade Gutierrez et al v. Reilly
Plaintiff: Joan Miguel Diaz Rodriguez and Maria Elena Andrade Gutierrez
Defendant: Edward Reilly
Case Number: 1:2024cv03953
Filed: May 31, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joseph A Marutollo
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2024 Filing 16 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo for all further proceedings. Judge Brian M. Cogan no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (JVC)
July 23, 2024 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Maria Elena Andrade Gutierrez, Joan Miguel Diaz Rodriguez. (O'Gara, Aran)
July 23, 2024 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal for RYDER ONLY by Maria Elena Andrade Gutierrez, Joan Miguel Diaz Rodriguez (O'Gara, Aran)
July 23, 2024 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: A status conference before Magistrate Judge Marutollo will be held on August 2, 2024 at 9:30 a.m. The parties shall call (646) 828-7666; Meeting ID: 161 213 7132 ; Passcode: 008519 to participate in the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 7/23/2024. (EG)
July 22, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER re: #13 . Request denied. Proceed under Rule 55. In addition, counsel is advised that this letter should have been designated as an ECF event Letter "Motion" since it seeks relief from the Court. Do not refile. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/22/2024. (PW)
July 19, 2024 Filing 13 Letter re Default Judgment by Edward Reilly (Kelly, John)
July 19, 2024 Filing 12 Request for Certificate of Default by Edward Reilly (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Verified Answer, #3 Reilly Affidavit) (Kelly, John)
July 17, 2024 Minute Entry and Order for Initial Status Conference held before Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/17/2024. Defendant Reilly is directed to request entry of default with respect to its counterclaim by 7/19/2024. Plaintiffs shall voluntarily dismiss defendant Ryder by 7/24/2024, failing which Ryder shall file a motion to dismiss the claims against it by 7/26/2024; plaintiffs to pay attorneys' fees if the motion is granted. By 7/24/2024, plaintiffs shall also add defendant Reilly's employer as a defendant in this action, otherwise they will be precluded from doing so, and provide authorizations and releases regarding plaintiff's prior injury and corresponding medical treatment. Plaintiffs shall serve written discovery requests by 7/29/2024 and produce written discovery by 8/7/2024; defendant shall produce written discovery by 8/19/2024. The parties shall complete all fact depositions and conduct independent medical examinations by 9/19/2024, the date fact discovery ends. The Court will set an expert discovery schedule at the end of fact discovery. (PW)
July 16, 2024 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Status Conference is reset to 10:30 am on 7/17/2024. The parties will call 571-353-2301 and enter Meeting ID 020454116#. (PW)
July 12, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Connors, Jr on behalf of Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Connors, John)
July 11, 2024 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Maria Elena Andrade Gutierrez, Joan Miguel Diaz Rodriguez. (O'Gara, Aran)
July 3, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Aran James O'Gara on behalf of Maria Elena Andrade Gutierrez, Joan Miguel Diaz Rodriguez (aty to be noticed) (O'Gara, Aran)
July 1, 2024 Minute Entry and Order for Initial Status Conference held before Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/28/2024. Counsel for plaintiffs and defendant Reilly appeared by telephone. Due to an anticipated change in plaintiff's counsel, the initial status conference is continued to 7/17/2024 at 10:00 am, at which the parties can expect to be placed on a prompt discovery and trial schedule. By that date, plaintiffs must provide all necessary authorizations and releases to defendants; otherwise, plaintiffs' counsel will face sanctions. Additionally, if plaintiff Andrade Gutierrez has not responded to the counterclaim against her by that date, default will be entered against her. The parties are directed to call 571-353-2301 and enter Meeting ID 020454116#. (PW)
June 27, 2024 Filing 8 Letter to Judge Brian M. Cogan (Joint Letter for Initial Conference) by Edward Reilly (Attachments: #1 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN) (Kelly, John)
June 27, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Joseph Pfuhler on behalf of Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Pfuhler, Robert)
June 27, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER re: #8 . The parties joint request to adjourn the Initial Status Conference scheduled for tomorrow 6/28 is denied. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/27/2024. (PW)
June 12, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Madeeha Syed on behalf of Edward Reilly (aty to be noticed) (Syed, Madeeha)
June 4, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John Kelly on behalf of Edward Reilly (notification declined or already on case) (Kelly, John)
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic Initial Status Conference is set for 6/28/2024 at 12:00 pm. The parties are directed to call 571-353-2301 and enter Meeting ID 020454116#. See attached mandatory requirements for the conference. In addition, plaintiff is directed to serve on defendant a complete set of medical releases and HIPAA authorizations prior to the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/4/2024. (PW)
June 3, 2024 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
June 3, 2024 This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (KD)
June 3, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)
May 31, 2024 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal, by Edward Reilly (Kelly, John)
May 31, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Edward Reilly from Supreme Queens, case number 724387/2023. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANYEDC-17933373) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Answer and Demands, #3 Exhibit Ryder Answer and Demands, #4 Exhibit BP, #5 Exhibit Preliminary Conference Order) (Kelly, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrade Gutierrez et al v. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Miguel Diaz Rodriguez
Represented By: Aran James O'Gara
Represented By: Vel Belushin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Elena Andrade Gutierrez
Represented By: Aran James O'Gara
Represented By: Vel Belushin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Reilly
Represented By: Madeeha Syed
Represented By: John Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?