Gilead Sciences, Inc. et al v. Khaim et al
Case Number: 1:2024cv04259
Filed: October 12, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 211 OPINION AND ORDER - For the reasons set forth in the attached Opinion and Order, the Court grants Gilead's motion 197 . The Court orders that, within thirty days of the date of this order, Defendant shall comply with the subpoena and produce a ll non-privileged documents and information sufficient to show (1) the source of all payments from or on behalf of Defendant to Moses & Singer since commencement of her representation in the Criminal Action; and (2) the dates and amounts of all payments from or on behalf of Defendant received by Moses & Singer since commencement of her representation in the Criminal Action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 4/21/2025. (EG)
March 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER: So ordered 195 , per the attached. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 3/12/2025. (EG)
December 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Dkt. No. 154 and Dkt. No. 169 , for the reasons set forth in the attached Opinion and Order. Gilead and Ms. Polvanova shall comply with the deadlines set in the attached Opinion and Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 12/22/2024. (JAM)
November 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 146 OPINION AND ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 11/5/2024. (EG)
October 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER denying 115 133 . For the reasons set forth in the attached Opinion and Order, Ms. Polvanova's Motion to Stay Discovery is DENIED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 10/12/2024. (JAM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilead Sciences, Inc. et al v. Khaim et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?