Phillip v. The State of New York
Plaintiff: Miller L Phillip
Defendant: The State of New York
Case Number: 1:2025cv00953
Filed: February 18, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Hector Gonzalez
Referring Judge: Taryn A Merkl
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Order,, the Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Western District of New York pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Decision on Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis is reserved for the transferee court. This Court offers no opinion on the merits of the claim. That provision of Rule 83.1 of the Local Rules of the Eastern District of New York which requires a seven-day delay is waived. No summons shall issue from this Court. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order to pro se Plaintiff, along with a form for habeas petitions pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254, and note the mailing on the docket.Ordered by Judge Hector Gonzalez on 2/24/2025. (VRM)
February 24, 2025 Case transferred to the Western District of New York. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (VRM)
February 24, 2025 Case transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in U.S. District Court, Western District of New York as case 1:25-cv-00171, filed 02/24/2025. (TLH)
February 20, 2025 Filing 2 Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link: #https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf (CV)
February 18, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The State of New York, filed by Miller Phillip. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (CV)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillip v. The State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miller L Phillip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?