Nixon v. Long Island Rail Road Company
Plaintiff: Kathleen Nixon
Defendant: Long Island Rail Road Company
Case Number: 1:2025cv01007
Filed: February 24, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: Joseph A Marutollo
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2025 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Long Island Rail Road Company identifying Corporate Parent MTA, Other Affiliate MTA NYC Transit Authority, Other Affiliate MTA Staten Island Railway, Other Affiliate MTA Capital Construction, Other Affiliate MTA Bus Company, Other Affiliate MTA Bridges and Tunnels, Other Affiliate MTA Metro North Commuter Railroad for Long Island Rail Road Company. (Pogan, Christopher)
March 13, 2025 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Long Island Rail Road Company. (Pogan, Christopher)
March 3, 2025 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathleen Nixon. Long Island Rail Road Company served on 3/3/2025, answer due 3/24/2025. (Lauriello, Valerie)
February 25, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held on May 20, 2025 at 12:00 p.m. in Courtroom 324 North before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo. The parties must complete the attached proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order and file it on ECF no later than May 16, 2025. Plaintiff is directed to ensure that all Defendants are aware of this conference. Counsel with knowledge of the case must attend the conference; per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. The parties are directed to review this Court's Individual Practices and Rules in advance of the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 2/25/2025. (Attachments: #1 Individual Practices and Rules) (EG)
February 24, 2025 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (CV)
February 24, 2025 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Long Island Rail Road Company, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (CV)
February 24, 2025 Filing 2 Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link: #https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf (CV)
February 24, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Long Island Rail Road Company filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18790680 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Kathleen Nixon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lauriello, Valerie)
February 24, 2025 Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CV)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nixon v. Long Island Rail Road Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Nixon
Represented By: Valerie J. Lauriello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Island Rail Road Company
Represented By: Christopher J Pogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?