Lewis v. NYS Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Luchiano Lewis and Luchiana Owens
Defendant: NYC Police Department, Board of Corrections, Attorney General's Office, New York Post (newspaper), NYS Supreme Court, Crossroads Juvenile Center, ABC News, CBS and Daily News
Case Number: 1:2025cv01050
Filed: February 25, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Diane Gujarati
Referring Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2025 Filing 7 Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link: #https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf (KD)
February 25, 2025 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of New York Western; Case Number 6:24-cv-06642. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 25, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that this action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 2/25/2025. (TF)This was mailed to: Plaintiff. [Transferred from New York Western on 2/25/2025.]
November 25, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Luchiano Lewis (plaintiff's address updated). (TF) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/25/2025.]
November 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that Owens will be dismissed as a Plaintiff in this action and her claims dismissed without prejudice unless she either (1) submits a properly supported motion to proceed informa pauperis or (2) pays the $350.00 filing fee and the $55.00 administrative fee ($405.00 total), no later than 30 days from the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to send to Owens a form motion to proceed in forma pauperis with supporting affirmation. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 11/7/2024. (TF)This was mailed to: Plaintiff Lewis. [Transferred from New York Western on 2/25/2025.]
November 1, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Luchiano Lewis.(TF) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/25/2025.]
November 1, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Luchiano Lewis and Luchiana Owens. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TF) Modified on 11/1/2024 (TF). [Transferred from New York Western on 2/25/2025.]
November 1, 2024 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. Prisoner Pro Se packet consisting of Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, and Civil Case Timeline mailed to plaintiff. (TF) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/25/2025.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. NYS Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luchiano Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luchiana Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYC Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Post (newspaper)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYS Supreme Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crossroads Juvenile Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC News
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daily News
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?