Pall Corporation v. Cuno Incorporated
Plaintiff: Pall Corporation
Defendant: Cuno Incorporated
Counter Claimant: Cuno Incorporated
Counter Defendant: Pall Corporation
Case Number: 2:2003cv00092
Filed: January 20, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Central Islip Office
Presiding Judge: E. Thomas Boyle
Presiding Judge: Roslynn R. Mauskopf
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER DENYING RECONSIDERATION IN PART: For the reasons set forth in the attached order, the Court denies 3M's motion for reconsideration in part 425 with respect to the h-max formula. The Court will hear oral argument on the HDC-II filter iss ue on Thursday, 9/17/2015 at 2:00 pm in Courtroom 4F North. The attached opinion also makes a correction to this Court's 3/31/2015 Order 420 Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 8/20/2015. Associated Cases: 9:97-cv-07599-PKC-SIL, 2:03-cv-00092-PKC-SIL (Chiang, May)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 269 Motion for Attorney Fees: Defendant is awarded $34,350.00 in attorney's fees and $7,697.45 in costs, for a total award of $42,047.45. Plaintiff shall make payment within twenty (20) days. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Thomas Boyle on 6/1/2012. (Minerva, Deanna)
March 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 237 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION: For the reasons contained in the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order, defendant's motion for sanctions is denied. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Thomas Boyle on 3/25/2011. (Minerva, Deanna)
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 193 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION: Cuno's motion to compel is granted. Pall is directed to produce the withheld documents that pertain to the reexamination proceedings before the PTO within ten (10) days of the date of this Order. Depositions of Pall 9;s counsel shall proceed, as directed by the Order dated April 8, 2010. Failure to comply with this Order will result in Pall being precluded from offering evidence of its good faith in defense to Cuno's inequtiable conduct conterclaim at the trial in this action. Discovery is extended an additional thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Thomas Boyle on 6/8/2010. (Minerva, Deanna)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION: For the reasons contained in the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order, defendant's motion to amend its Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims is granted in its entirety. Defendant is directed to file its Amended Answer within five (5) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is directed to file its Reply to defendant's Counterclaims within ten (10) days of the date of this Order. The parties are requested to provide a revised discovery schedule on or before February 15, 2010. SEE Memorandum Opinion & Order for further details. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Thomas Boyle on 1/20/2010. (Minerva, Deanna)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pall Corporation v. Cuno Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Cuno Incorporated
Represented By: Michael I. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cuno Incorporated
Represented By: Michael I. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Pall Corporation
Represented By: H. Michael Hartmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pall Corporation
Represented By: H. Michael Hartmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?