Depascale et al v. Sylvania Electronic Products, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs sued defendants Sylvania Electronic Products, Inc., General Telephone and Electric, Inc. and Verizon Communications, Inc. for exposing them to toxic chemicals and radioactive substances at 100 Cantiague Rock Road, Hicksville, New York.

Plaintiff: Gerard Depascale, Liam Neville and Joanne Depascale
Defendant: Sylvania Electronic Products, Inc., General Telephone and Electric, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Does 1-1000 and All Defendants
Case Number: 2:2007cv03558
Filed: August 24, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Central Islip Office
County: Nassau
Presiding Judge: Arlene R. Lindsay
Presiding Judge: Leonard D. Wexler
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re 167 letter. SO ORDERED that no further pretrial conferences will be held and jury selection will proceed as scheduled. Ordered by Senior Judge Leonard D. Wexler on 6/27/2011. (Glueckert, Lisa)
October 9, 2007 Filing 9
NOTICE by Verizon Communications, Inc., Sylvania Electronic Products, Inc., General Telephone and Electric, Inc. re 7 Notice of MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 2594737., 8 Affidavit, [Proposed] Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice (Phillips, John)
October 5, 2007 Filing 6
STIPULATION re. Extension of Time by Gerard Depascale (Gonzalez, Joseph)
September 28, 2007 Filing 4
Letter requestion Pre-Motion Conference in contemplation of a Motiton to Dismiss by All Defendants (Kouril, Cynthia)
August 31, 2007 Filing 3
STIPULATION re 1 Notice of Removal, extending defendants Sylvania Electrical Products, Inc., General Telephone and Electric, Inc., and Verizon Communications, Inc. time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint by Verizon Communications, Inc. (Kouril, Cynthia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Depascale et al v. Sylvania Electronic Products, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerard Depascale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liam Neville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Depascale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvania Electronic Products, Inc.
Represented By: William H. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Telephone and Electric, Inc.
Represented By: John P. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Communications, Inc.
Represented By: William H. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-1000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?