United Van Lines, LLC v. Crye-Leike, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: United Van Lines, LLC
Defendant: Crye-Leike, Inc., Ricky Pineda, Katrina Smith, Nathan Merrill, Michael Surowiec, Henry Li, Sally Hamilton and Douglas Adair
Case Number: 2:2007cv05013
Filed: December 3, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Central Islip Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: Denis R. Hurley
Presiding Judge: Arlene R. Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1337 Sherman-Clayton Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting 67 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff has established that defendant is liable as a matter of law for tariff charges associated with plaintiff's move in the amount of $9,394.09 in addition to prejudgment interest in th e amount of $815.08, for a total judgment in the amount of $10,209.17. Furthermore, plaintiff is entitled to judgment against defendant Pineda in the amount of $14,124.41. The clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment against both Adair and Pineda as set forth above and to close this case. Counsel for United Van is directed to serve a copy of this Order on defendant Adair and file proof of service on ECF. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 10/29/2013. (Kaley, Regina)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER: The March 10, 2009 Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay 44 is hereby adopted. However, because Plaintiff has ongoing claims against another defendant, viz. Douglas Adair ("Adair"), and has filed a motio n for summary judgment against Adair which is presently pending before the Court, the Court will not direct the entry of judgment against defendant Ricardo Pineda at this time. See attached Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Denis R. Hurley on 11/18/2009.
March 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 20 : See attached. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 3/10/2009. (c/ecf) (Warshaw, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Van Lines, LLC v. Crye-Leike, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Van Lines, LLC
Represented By: George W. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crye-Leike, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Pineda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katrina Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Surowiec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?