Thieriot et al v. Jaspan Schlesinger Hoffman, LLP et al
Case Number: 2:2007cv05315
Filed: December 20, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Central Islip Office
Presiding Judge: Thomas C. Platt
Presiding Judge: A. Kathleen Tomlinson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity - Legal Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER denying 132 Motion for Reconsideration. For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order, plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration is denied. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 11/10/2016. (Kaley, Regina)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 120 Motion in Limine. For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order, defendants' motions in limine are granted in part and denied in part. Specifically, defendants' motion to b ar plaintiffs from pursuing the Lost Profits Claim is granted. However, defendants' motion to prohibit plaintiffs from pursuing their other damage theories is denied, as is defendants' motion to prohibit purportedly inconsistent claims as well as claims contained in the Berkowitz Report that it purports are not contained in the Complaint. Plaintiffs' motion to amend its pre-trial order to include a claim of pre-judgment interest on the Lost Opportunity Claim is granted. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 10/18/2016. (Kaley, Regina)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting 87 Motion for Reconsideration. For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order, plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration is granted, and the First Reconsideration Order is vacated in its entirety. The Summary Judgment Order of March 6, 2013 is the operative order. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 2/6/2015. (Kaley, Regina)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting 78 Motion for Reconsideration for the 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jaspan Schlesinger Hoffman, LLP, Lisa M. Golden, Alan K. Hirschhorn, Seth H. Ross, Stephen P. Epstein. For the foregoing reasons, defendan ts' motion for reconsideration is hereby granted and summary judgment is granted in favor of defendants on all of plaintiff's claims and the complaint is dismissed in its entirety. Defendants' counterclaim for legal fees and costs is to be determined under a quantum meruit theory and is referred to Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson to report and recommend to the undersigned. So Ordered by Judge Thomas C. Platt on 8/27/2013. (Padilla, Kristin)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER re 45 Motion to Compel denied. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 9/28/2011. (Tomlinson, A.)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER re 42 Motion for Discovery. For the reasons set forth in the attached Order, Plaintiff's Motion is GRANTED, in part. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 9/30/10. (Montero, Edher)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thieriot et al v. Jaspan Schlesinger Hoffman, LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?