Daniels v. Ercole
Petitioner: Anthony T. Daniels
Respondent: Robert Ercole
Case Number: 2:2008cv01424
Filed: March 31, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: Joanna Seybert
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM & ORDER - The Court DENIES Petitioner's Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus. So Ordered by Judge Thomas C. Platt on 11/14/13. (Coleman, Laurie)
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - Pending before the Court is Judge Wall's Report and Recommendation recommending that the Court deny Petitioner's 12 Motion to Amend. For the reasons set forth herein, the Court ADOPTS Judge Wall's R&R and DENIES Petitioner's motion to amend. Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 7/29/09. C/M; C/ECF (Valle, Christine)
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 12 Notice of MOTION for Leave to File Amended Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Anthony T. Daniels The undersigned recommends that the motion be denied. See attached. Ordered by Magistrate Judge William D. Wall on 6/9/2009. c/m to pro se p (Hepworth, F.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniels v. Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony T. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?