Getlin v. Zoll et al
Plaintiff: Dorian Getlin
Defendant: The Incorporated Village of Hempstead and P.O. John Zoll
Case Number: 2:2008cv01872
Filed: August 11, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Central Islip Office
Presiding Judge: Denis R. Hurley
Presiding Judge: A. Kathleen Tomlinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM & ORDER denying 51 Motion for Summary Judgment. See attached. Ordered by Senior Judge Denis R. Hurley on 3/28/2012. (Malley, Sean)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion for Summary Judgment: The § 1983 claim as against Defendant Incorporated Village of Hempstead is dismissed and the motion for summary judgment is otherwise denied. See attached Memorandum & Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Denis R. Hurley on 4/20/2010.
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re 12 Motion to Dismiss: The motion to dismiss is converted to a motion for summary judgment and a briefing schedule is established. See attached. Ordered by Senior Judge Denis R. Hurley on 8/11/2009. (Gapinski, Michele)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Getlin v. Zoll et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorian Getlin
Represented By: Alan D. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Incorporated Village of Hempstead
Represented By: Laurel R. Kretzing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.O. John Zoll
Represented By: Laurel R. Kretzing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?