Camac et al v. The Long Beach City School District et al
Case Number: 2:2009cv05309
Filed: December 4, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other Office
Presiding Judge: Denis R. Hurley
Presiding Judge: Arlene R. Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order, the Court adopts the 75 February 3, 2015 report and recommendations of Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. The Court grants Defendants' 64 motion for summary judgment. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 2/27/2015. (Krause, Aimee)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order, the Court adopts the Report & Recommendation in its entirety and the parties' request to have the infant compromise approved is denied. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 3/13/2013. (Thomas, Alora)
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re 10 Motion to Dismiss. For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum & Order, Defendants' motion to dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. Ordered by Senior Judge Denis R. Hurley on 7/22/2011. (Monaco, Laura)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Camac et al v. The Long Beach City School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?