Alterseekers, Inc. v. Brandforce SF, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Alterseekers, Inc.
Defendant: BrandForce Health, Inc., Brandforce Health, LLC, Brandforce SF, LLC and David Flaherty
Case Number: 2:2012cv05392
Filed: October 25, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Central Islip Office
Presiding Judge: Gary R. Brown
Presiding Judge: Sandra J. Feuerstein
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE 89 Motion for Summary Judgment. See attached Memorandum and Order for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 9/15/2017. c/ecf (Johnston, Linda)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re 74 : See attached Memorandum and Order for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 9/29/2015. c/ecf (Johnston, Linda)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. SO ORDERED that defts' motion is denied except insofar as BrandForce Health is dismissed from the case without prejudice for lack of personal jurisdiction. BrandForce Health, Inc. terminated. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 9/16/2013. (Florio, Lisa)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alterseekers, Inc. v. Brandforce SF, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alterseekers, Inc.
Represented By: Seunghwan Kim
Represented By: James E. Nealon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BrandForce Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandforce Health, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandforce SF, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?