Mendez et al v. U.S. Nonwovens Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Aldraily Alberto Coiscou, Siryi Nayrobik Melendez, Efrain Danilo Mendez, Fernando Molina and Rene Alexander Oliva
Defendant: Rody Mehdizadeh, Samuel Mehdizadeh, Shervin Mehdizadeh Mehdizadeh and U.S. Nonwovens Corp.
Case Number: 2:2012cv05583
Filed: November 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Central Islip Office
Presiding Judge: Arthur D. Spatt
Presiding Judge: William D. Wall
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER granting 175 Motion. For the reasons set forth in the attached Order, Defendants' motion to decertify the FLSA collective is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 3/31/2016. (Disbrow, Sandra)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 189 MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 170 Motion to Certify Class - For the foregoing reasons, the Court (i) denies the Plaintiffs motion to certify sub-classes with respect to the third, fourth, and seventh causes of action; (ii) grants the Plaintiffs motion and certifies a class solely with respect to the fifth cause of action, which the Court defines as [a]ll non-exempt workers employed by U.S. Nonwovens in the State of New York at any time from November 14, 2006 to the present who allege that they were not paid a spread of hours premium pursuant to 12 NYCRR § 142-2.4; (iii) appoints the named Plaintiffs as class representatives; (iv) appoints Moser as class counsel pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g); and (v) directs the Defendants to produce to the Plaintiffs a list of all potential class members within twenty days of this Order containing the information described above. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 1/15/2016. (Coleman, Laurie)
September 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER - Accordingly, Court hereby respectfully refers the Defendants 175 motion to decertify the collective action pursuant to FLSA § 216 to United States Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke, who shall decide this motion. This Court will decide the 170 motion by the Plaintiff to certify a class action pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23, as that is considered to be a dispositive motion. The Clerk of Court is to note the referral. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 9/19/15. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 9/19/2015. (Coleman, Laurie)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER granting 18 Motion to Amend the Complaint; It is hereby ORDERED, that the motion by the Plaintiffs to amend their Original Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 is granted; and it is further ORDERED, that the P laintiffs are directed to file the Revised Amended Complaint that was included with their reply papers within ten days of the date of this Order. Further, to the extent the Revised Amended Complaint contains footnotes, the Plaintiffs are directed to remove these footnotes in accordance with this Courts Individual Rule II.A, but may incorporate the substance of the footnotes into the text of the Revised Amended Complaint. However, the Plaintiffs shall not make any other changes to the Revised Amended Complaint without first seeking court approval pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 3/5/2014. (Coleman, Laurie)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendez et al v. U.S. Nonwovens Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aldraily Alberto Coiscou
Represented By: Steven John Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Siryi Nayrobik Melendez
Represented By: Steven John Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Efrain Danilo Mendez
Represented By: Steven John Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Molina
Represented By: Steven John Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rene Alexander Oliva
Represented By: Steven John Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rody Mehdizadeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Mehdizadeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shervin Mehdizadeh Mehdizadeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Nonwovens Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?