Lopez et al v. Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center et al
Plaintiff: Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez and Santos Natividad Cali Zambrano
Defendant: Mark Chait, Karp Enterprises Inc., Steven Saviano, Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center and TLCW, Inc
Case Number: 2:2012cv06324
Filed: December 21, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Central Islip Office
Presiding Judge: Arlene R. Lindsay
Presiding Judge: Leonard D. Wexler
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 128 Motion to Certify FLSA Collective Action. For the reasons stated herein, plaintiffs' motion for Rule 23 class certification on Plaintiffs claims under New York law is granted. (Ordered by Judge Leonard D. Wexler on 1/5/2016.) (Fagan, Linda)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 131 Motion for Summary Judgment. For the reasons stated herein, Defendants' motion for summary judgment is denied. Counsel are reminded that jury selection is scheduled for January 4, 2016.Ordered by Judge Leonard D. Wexler on 9/17/2015.) (Fagan, Linda)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; Having reviewed the parties' submissions in connection with the motion to amend and Plaintiffs' objections, the R&R of Magistrate Judge Lindsay of October 2, 2014 is hereby adopted in part, and modified in part. The Co urt adopts the R&R to the extent it grants Plaintiffs' motionto amend the complaint to join Alvarado, Garcia, Zepeda and Canas as named Plaintiffs. The Court modifies the R&R to grant Plaintiffs' motion to amend the complaint to join Plaint iffs Denis Omar and Dennis Osvaldo; and further modifies the R&R to grant Plaintiffs' motion that the NYLL claims for the new Plaintiffs relate back to the original filing. All counsel are directed to appear for a conference in Courtroom 940 on January 21,2015 at 10:30a.m. (Ordered by Judge Leonard D. Wexler on 1/7/2015.) (Fagan, Linda)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez et al v. Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Chait
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karp Enterprises Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Saviano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TLCW, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez
Represented By: Peter Arcadio Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santos Natividad Cali Zambrano
Represented By: Peter Arcadio Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?