Sea Metropolitan S.A. v. DGM Commodities Corp.
Petitioner: Sea Metropolitan S.A.
Respondent: DGM Commodities Corp.
Case Number: 2:2013cv01521
Filed: March 22, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Central Islip Office
Presiding Judge: Denis R. Hurley
Presiding Judge: A. Kathleen Tomlinson
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The Court has reviewed the record, and, finding no clear error, adopts the R & R in its entirety. Accordingly, the Court confirms the arbitration award dated February 20, 2013 against respondent DGM Commodi ties Corp., but orders that payment of that award and any determination concerning attorneys' fees and costs be deferred until resolution of the claims against the non-defaulting defendants. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 3/2/2015. (Petilla, Charlotte)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION Neither petitioner's proposed order nor Elua's proposed counter-order adequately reflects the Court's August 2, 2013 decision. Accordingly, with the aid provided by their respective proposed orders and accompanyi ng letters addressing the applicable law, attached hereto is a copy of the implementing order prepared and entered this date by the Court. As to Elua's motion for reconsideration, the Court adheres to its original decision. The parties are directed to contact Judge Tomlinson's Chambers to address any discovery matters and other actions that may be necessary before this case may be marked ready for trial.. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 10/2/2013. (Lundy, Lisa)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion for Writ; granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. For the reasons set forth in the attached memorandum, petitioner's request for relief is granted as to DGM Commodities and Mr. Elua, but otherwise denied. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 8/2/2013. (Kaley, Regina)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sea Metropolitan S.A. v. DGM Commodities Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DGM Commodities Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sea Metropolitan S.A.
Represented By: Michael E. Unger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?