Brooks v. Educational Bus Transportation et al
Plaintiff: Dolly Brooks
Defendant: Educational Bus Transportation and United Service Workers Union
Case Number: 2:2014cv03237
Filed: May 23, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Central Islip Office
Presiding Judge: Sandra J. Feuerstein
Presiding Judge: Arlene R. Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER: For the foregoing reasons (PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS), plaintiffs motion for reconsideration of the November 12, 2015 Order and final judgment against her is granted but, upon reconsideration, I adhere to my original determination t o (1) deny her applications for the entry of a default judgment against the Union; (2) grant the Unions application to dismiss plaintiffs claims against it pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and dismiss plaintiffs claims ag ainst the Union in their entirety for her failure to effect service upon it; (3) overrule plaintiffs objections to the Report and accept the Report in its entirety; and (4) grant EBTs motion for summary judgment pursuant to Rule 56 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and dismiss plaintiffs claims against EBT in their entirety with prejudice. So Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 7/6/2016. (c/m to pro se) (Ortiz, Grisel)
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: SO ORDERED that plaintiffs applications for the entry of a default judgment against the Union are denied; the Unions application to dismiss plaintiffs claims against it pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal R ules of Civil Procedure is granted; plaintiffs claims against the Union are dismissed in their entirety pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for plaintiffs failure to effect service upon it; plaintiffs objections to the Repor t are overruled; the Report is accepted in its entirety; and, for the reasons set forth therein, EBTs motion for summary judgment pursuant to Rule 56 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is granted and plaintiffs claims against EBT are dismissed i n their entirety with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in accordance with this Order; close this case; and, pursuant to Rule 77(d)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, serve notice of entry of this Order upon plaintiff as provided in Rule 5(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and record such service on the docket. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of any appeal. CM to pro se plaintiff. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 11/12/2015. (Florio, Lisa)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. SO ORDERED that the application to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915. The Clerk of the Court is directed: (1) to forward to the United States Marshal for the Eastern District of New York copies of plaintiffs summonses, the complaint, the Notice of Hearing dated June 2, 2014 and this Order for service upon defts without prepayment of fees; and, (2) pursuant to Ru1e 77(d)(l) of the Federal Ru1es of Civ il Procedure, to serve notice of entry of this Order upon plaintiff as provided in Rule 5(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and record such service on the docket. CM to pro se plaintiff. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 6/2/2014. (Florio, Lisa)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Educational Bus Transportation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dolly Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Educational Bus Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Service Workers Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?