Silver et al v. Karp et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Silver, Lyle Silver and David Silver
Defendant: Beth E. Karp, Jeffrey Karp, Jeffrey Karp, Beth Karp & David Silver Partnership and Beth Karp & Lyle Silver Partnership
3Rd Party Defendant: Scott Silver
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Selwyn Karp
Case Number: 2:2014cv05226
Filed: September 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Central Islip Office
Presiding Judge: Gary R Brown
Referring Judge: Denis R Hurley
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The stipulation of dismissal with prejudice is So Ordered and this case closed. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 1/20/2016. (Gapinski, Michele)
January 19, 2016 Filing 60 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Beth E. Karp(an individual), Jeffrey Karp(an individual), Selwyn Karp (Filosa, Anthony)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order STATUS REPORT ORDER : A stipulation of discontinuance was due by December 10, 2015, to date nothing has been filed. A stipulation of discontinuace, or in the alternative aStatus Report is due by 1/19/2016.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 1/5/2016. (McMorrow, Karen)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER re #58 Letter filed by Stephen Silver, David Silver, Lyle Silver, Scott Silver, #59 Letter filed by Beth E. Karp, Jeffrey Karp, Selwyn Karp. Plaintiffs' motion for a telephonic conference is denied as moot. By December 10, 2015, the parties' shall file the Stipulation of Discontinuance with the district court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 12/3/2015.c/ecf (Johnston, Linda)
December 2, 2015 Filing 59 Letter by Beth E. Karp(an individual), Jeffrey Karp(an individual), Selwyn Karp (Filosa, Anthony)
November 25, 2015 Filing 58 Letter requesting a telephone conference with the Court on Monday, November 30, 2015 by David Silver, Lyle Silver, Scott Silver, Stephen Silver (Mitchell, Jeffrey)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #57 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The deadline to file a stipulation of discontinuance is hereby EXTENDED to November 23, 2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 10/13/2015. (Yim, Kevin)
October 8, 2015 Filing 57 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal by Beth E. Karp(an individual), Jeffrey Karp(an individual), Selwyn Karp. (Filosa, Anthony)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER re #55 #56 : Plaintiffs' motion to compel is denied as moot. Defense counsel has represented that he will submit a draft settlement agreement to plaintiffs' counsel by October 9, 2015. The deadline to file the Stipulation of Discontinuance is extended to October 23, 2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 9/28/2015. c/ecf (Johnston, Linda)
September 25, 2015 Filing 56 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal by Beth E. Karp(an individual), Jeffrey Karp(an individual), Selwyn Karp. (Filosa, Anthony)
September 24, 2015 Filing 55 Letter MOTION to Compel /Direct Karp parties to provide a draft agreement by David Silver, Lyle Silver, Scott Silver, Stephen Silver. (Mitchell, Jeffrey)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #54 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The parties shall file a stipulation of discontinuance with District Judge Hurley by September 25, 2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 9/14/2015. c/ecf (Johnston, Linda)
September 11, 2015 Filing 54 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal by Beth E. Karp(an individual), Jeffrey Karp(an individual), Selwyn Karp. (Filosa, Anthony)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER withdrawing #49 Motion for Contempt. In light of the parties' settlement of this action, the motion for contempt is deemed withdrawn. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 9/4/2015. c/ecf (Johnston, Linda)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER: The parties have both accepted the settlement proposed by the Court. Counsel for the parties shall contact each other to finalize the details of the settlement agreement and file a stipulation of discontinuance with District Judge Hurley by September 11, 2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 9/4/2015. c/ecf (Johnston, Linda)
August 27, 2015 Filing 53 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown: Settlement Conference held on 8/27/2015. Proposed settlement pending: By 9/4/2015, each party shall notify the court by ex parte letter to chambers at (631) 712-5705 whether it accepts or rejects the proposed settlement. These letters will be kept confidential. (Johnston, Linda) Modified on 9/1/2015 (McMorrow, Karen).
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: re #48 MOTION for Contempt and seeking enforcement of Court's 9/23/2014 Order filed by Stephen Silver, David Silver, Lyle Silver, Scott Silver. The Court will address plaintiffs' motion on 8/27/2015 02:00 p.m. prior to the settlement conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 8/3/2015. c/ecf (Johnston, Linda)
July 30, 2015 Motions terminated, docketed incorrectly: #52 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Colleen Kilfoyle filed by Stephen Silver, David Silver, Lyle Silver, Scott Silver. (The document should have been filed as a "NOTICE" for the reason that the defendant's are still represented by other counsel from the same firm. All corrections have been made.) (Fagan, Linda)
July 30, 2015 Filing 52 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Colleen Kilfoyle by David Silver, Lyle Silver, Scott Silver, Stephen Silver. (Kilfoyle, Colleen)
July 30, 2015 Filing 51 REPLY to Response to Motion re #49 MOTION for Contempt and seeking enforcement of Court's 9/23/2014 Order (supplemental letter on the motion) filed by David Silver, Lyle Silver, Scott Silver, Stephen Silver. (Mitchell, Jeffrey)
July 29, 2015 Filing 50 RESPONSE in Opposition re #49 MOTION for Contempt and seeking enforcement of Court's 9/23/2014 Order filed by Beth E. Karp(an individual), Jeffrey Karp(an individual), Selwyn Karp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Wire Transfers, #2 Exhibit Checks, #3 Exhibit Transcript Excerpts) (Filosa, Anthony)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER. Defendant Karp is directed to respond to #49 motion for contempt by August 5, 2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 7/29/2015. (Yim, Kevin)
July 28, 2015 Filing 49 MOTION for Contempt and seeking enforcement of Court's 9/23/2014 Order by David Silver, Lyle Silver, Scott Silver, Stephen Silver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Mitchell, Jeffrey)
July 28, 2015 Filing 48 MOTION for Contempt and seeking enforcement of Court's 9/23/2014 Order by David Silver, Lyle Silver, Scott Silver, Stephen Silver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Mitchell, Jeffrey)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting in part and denying in part #46 Motion for Discovery. Plaintiff's application for an order precluding defendants from relying on information in any documents not produced as of July 17, 2015 is Denied. Defendants are directed to produce any outstanding discovery to plaintiffs by August 4, 2015. The time for plaintiff's counsel to serve their settlement demand to defense counsel is extended to August 18, 2015. Defense counsel shall serve their response to the demand upon plaintiff's counsel via electronic mail by 12:00 p.m. on August 24, 2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 7/28/2015. c/ecf (Johnston, Linda)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #48 . Plaintiff's letter application dated July 28, 2015 is denied with leave to renew. There is no indication that plaintiffs conferred with defendants on these issues prior to submission of the within application. Local Rule 37.3 and the undersigned's individual rules require the attorneys for the respective parties to confer in good faith in person or by telephone in an effort to resolve and/or narrow these issues prior to seeking judicial intervention. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 7/28/2015. c/ecf (Johnston, Linda)
July 27, 2015 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re #46 MOTION for Discovery - Failure to Comply filed by Beth E. Karp(an individual), Jeffrey Karp(an individual), Selwyn Karp. (Filosa, Anthony)
July 21, 2015 Filing 46 MOTION for Discovery - Failure to Comply by David Silver, Lyle Silver, Scott Silver, Stephen Silver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Cohen, Judith)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER. On consent, the status conference scheduled for July 7, 2015 is hereby ADJOURNED without date. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 7/6/2015. (Yim, Kevin)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECRONIC ORDER granting #45 Motion for Protective Order. The parties' proposed Confidentiality Stipulation and Order is SO ORDERED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 7/2/2015. c/ecf (Johnston, Linda)
July 1, 2015 Filing 45 MOTION for Protective Order /Confidentiality Stipulation and Order by David Silver, Lyle Silver, Scott Silver, Stephen Silver. (Mitchell, Jeffrey)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: On consent, a settlement conference is hereby scheduled for August 27, 2015 at 02:00 PM. The parties are directed to follow the undersigned's individual rules regarding settlement conferences. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 7/1/2015. (Yim, Kevin)
June 22, 2015 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith Rita Cohen on behalf of David Silver, Lyle Silver, Scott Silver, Stephen Silver (aty to be noticed) (Cohen, Judith)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #43 Motion to Adjourn Conference the 6/4 conference is adjourned to 7/7/2015 at 1:45 p.m.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 6/1/2015. (McMorrow, Karen)
May 29, 2015 Filing 43 Joint MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Beth E. Karp(an individual), Jeffrey Karp(an individual), Selwyn Karp. (Filosa, Anthony)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a change in the Court's schedule the status conference scheduled for 5/29/2015 is adjourned to 10:30 a.m. on 6/4/2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 5/27/2015. (McMorrow, Karen)
May 13, 2015 Filing 42 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/23/2015, before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Transcriber Transcription Plus II, Inc., Telephone number 917-945-1549. Email address: laferrara44@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/3/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/15/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/11/2015. (Cox, Dwayne)
April 30, 2015 Filing 41 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #38 Answer to Counterclaim, by Stephen Silver. (Mitchell, Jeffrey)
April 23, 2015 Filing 40 Minute Order. for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown:Status Conference held on 4/23/2015 re #19 Motion for Pre Motion Conference and #20 Motion to Compel. Stipulation put on the record. Status conference set for 5/29/2015 at 10:30 a.m. (McMorrow, Karen)
April 22, 2015 Filing 39 Letter providing status update regarding ECF Nos. 19, 20, 21 & 22 by Beth E. Karp(an individual), Jeffrey Karp(an individual), Selwyn Karp (Filosa, Anthony)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER re Order on Motion for Discovery. By Electronic Order dated March 31, 2015 the undersigned granted the parties' joint application to adjourn the conference scheduled for April 2, 2015 to, inter alia, permit the parties to determine whether they can narrow and/or resolve the disputed issues regarding docket entry nos. #19 - #22 without Court intervention. By the close of business today, the parties shall provide the Court with a status report of what, if any, discovery issues in those applications remain. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 4/22/2015. c/ecf (Johnston, Linda)
April 10, 2015 Filing 38 ANSWER to #36 Answer to Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim , COUNTERCLAIM against Stephen Silver by Selwyn Karp, Beth E. Karp, Jeffrey Karp. (Filosa, Anthony)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #37 Motion for Discovery. The parties' joint application to adjourn the conference scheduled for April 2, 2015 to April 23, 2015 at 11:00 a.m. in order to, inter alia, permit the parties to determine whether they can narrow and/or resolve the disputed issues without Court intervention is granted. The parties shall provide the Court with a status report regarding docket entry nos. 19 20 21 22 prior to the conference. The parties' proposed Discovery Plan Worksheet is So Ordered, and the initial conference is converted to a status conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 3/31/2015. (Johnston, Linda)
March 30, 2015 Filing 37 Joint MOTION for Discovery by Beth E. Karp, Jeffrey Karp, Selwyn Karp. (Filosa, Anthony)
March 20, 2015 Filing 36 ANSWER to #24 Third Party Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Selwyn Karp by Scott Silver, Stephen Silver. (Mitchell, Jeffrey)
March 20, 2015 Filing 35 ANSWER to #17 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Lyle Silver. (Mitchell, Jeffrey)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #34 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The parties application to adjourn the initial conference scheduled for March 11, 2015 to April 2, 2015 at 10:30 a.m. is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 3/2/2015. c/ecf (Johnston, Linda)
February 27, 2015 Filing 34 Consent MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Beth E. Karp, Jeffrey Karp, Selwyn Karp. (Filosa, Anthony)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #33 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #24 Third Party Complaint, #17 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim /Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Counterclaims and Third-Party Complaint. Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Lyle Silver's time to respond to the Counterclaim is extended to March 20, 2015. Third-Party Defendant Scott Silver's time to respond to the Third-Party Complaint is extended to March 20, 2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 2/27/2015. c/ecf (Johnston, Linda)
February 26, 2015 Filing 33 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #24 Third Party Complaint, #17 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim /Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Counterclaims and Third-Party Complaint by Lyle Silver, Scott Silver. (Mitchell, Jeffrey)
February 18, 2015 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Colleen Mary Kilfoyle on behalf of David Silver, Lyle Silver (aty to be noticed) (Kilfoyle, Colleen)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #31 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The conference is rescheduled for 3/11/15 at 11:30 a.m... Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 2/6/2015. (McMorrow, Karen)
February 5, 2015 Filing 31 Consent MOTION to Adjourn Conference originally scheduled for 2/11/2015 to 3/11/2015 at 11:30 am by David Silver, Lyle Silver, Scott Silver. (Mitchell, Jeffrey)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Lyle Silver's time to respond to the Counterclaim is extended to February 27, 2015. Third-Party Defendant Scott Silver's time to respond to the Third-Party Complaint is extended to February 27, 2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 1/28/2015. c/ecf (Johnston, Linda)
January 27, 2015 Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #24 Third Party Complaint, #17 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim /Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Counterclaims and Third-Party Complaint by Lyle Silver, Scott Silver. (Mitchell, Jeffrey)
January 15, 2015 Filing 29 STIPULATION & Proposed Order Substituting Plaintiffs' Counsel of Record by David Silver, Lyle Silver (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey A. Mitchell pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4) (Mitchell, Jeffrey) Modified on 1/16/2015 (Fagan, Linda).
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #28 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The conference scheduled for January 14, 2015 is adjourned to February 11, 2015 at 11:30 am. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 1/13/2015. c/ecf (Johnston, Linda)
January 12, 2015 Filing 28 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for 1/14/2015 at 11:30am by David Silver, Lyle Silver, Scott Silver. (Mitchell, Jeffrey)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Lyle Silver's time to respond to the Counterclaim is extended to January 31, 2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 1/6/2015.c/ecf (Johnston, Linda)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #27 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Added attorney Thomas Michael Guiffre for Lyle Silver and David Silver. Attorney Scott Lance Silver terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 1/6/2015. (Posillico, Lauren)
January 5, 2015 Filing 27 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitution of Plaintiffs' Counsel by David Silver, Lyle Silver. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Guiffre, Thomas)
January 5, 2015 Filing 26 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #17 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by David Silver, Lyle Silver. (Guiffre, Thomas)
January 5, 2015 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Michael Guiffre on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Guiffre, Thomas)
December 31, 2014 Filing 24 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Scott Silver, filed by Selwyn Karp. (Attachments: #1 Third Party Complaint) (Filosa, Anthony)
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: The parties shall prepare a discovery schedule in accordance with the attached Initial Conference Order for the hearing scheduled on 1/14/15 at 11:30 AM. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 12/30/2014. (Attachments: #1 GRB Individual Rules) (Posillico, Lauren)
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person conference has been scheduled for January 14, 2015 at 11:30 AM in courtroom 840 of the Central Islip courthouse, regarding docket entry nos. #19 #20 #21 #22 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 12/29/2014. c/ecf (Johnston, Linda)
December 22, 2014 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 Letter MOTION to Compel from Defendants Discovery Production, Interrogatory Answers, and Compliance with September 23, 2014 Court Order filed by Beth E. Karp, Jeffrey Karp, Selwyn Karp. (Filosa, Anthony)
December 19, 2014 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference , #19 Amended MOTION for pre motion conference re #18 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference filed by All Plaintiffs. (Silver, Scott)
December 18, 2014 Filing 20 Letter MOTION to Compel from Defendants Discovery Production, Interrogatory Answers, and Compliance with September 23, 2014 Court Order by David Silver, Lyle Silver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit "C") (Silver, Scott)
December 18, 2014 Filing 19 Amended MOTION for pre motion conference re #18 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Beth E. Karp, Jeffrey Karp, Selwyn Karp. (Filosa, Anthony)
December 18, 2014 Filing 18 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Beth E. Karp, Jeffrey Karp, Selwyn Karp. (Filosa, Anthony)
December 17, 2014 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Lyle Silver by Beth E. Karp, Selwyn Karp, Jeffrey Karp. (Filosa, Anthony)
September 25, 2014 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Beth E. Karp, Jeffrey Karp, Selwyn Karp. (Filosa, Anthony)
September 24, 2014 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by David I. Rosenberg on behalf of Beth E. Karp, Jeffrey Karp, Selwyn Karp (aty to be noticed) (Rosenberg, David)
September 24, 2014 Filing 13 Subpoena by David Silver, Lyle Silver. (Silver, Scott)
September 23, 2014 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Filosa on behalf of Beth E. Karp, Jeffrey Karp, Selwyn Karp (aty to be noticed) (Filosa, Anthony)
September 23, 2014 Filing 11 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown: Motion Hearing held on 9/23/2014 re #8 Notice of MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Notice of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by David Silver, Lyle Silver. TRO and preliminary injunction resolved as set forth on the record and the pending motion is withdrawn. By 11/21/2014 the parties are to exchange information available about monies invested in bank accounts. Answer to the complaint due 11/21/2014. Transcript sealed. (Tape 11:29-12:54)
September 19, 2014 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #8 Notice of MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Notice of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by David Silver, Lyle Silver. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of William Sorken) (Silver, Scott)
September 16, 2014 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David Silver, Lyle Silver and Proof of Service of September 15, 2014 Scheduling Order Setting Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proof of Service upon S. Karp, et al.), #2 Exhibit B (Proof of Service upon B. Karp)) (Silver, Scott)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: The in-person conference scheduled for September 17, 2014 is ADJOURNED to September 23, 2014 at 11:30 AM in courtroom 840 of the Central Islip courthouse. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 9/16/2014. (Demosthenous, Constantina)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER re #8 Notice of MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Notice of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by David Silver, Lyle Silver. It is hereby Ordered that plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction is respectfully referred to Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. It is further Ordered that the scope of the foregoing reference shall be deemed to encompass such additional authority as reasonable or necessary to perform the foregoing duties and as is not inconsistent with the Constitution or the laws of the United States. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 9/15/2014. (O'Connor, Madeline)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person conference has been scheduled for September 17, 2014 at 11:00 AM in courtroom 840 of the Central Islip courthouse, regarding the pending TRO and preliminary injunction motion #8 . Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to serve this order on defendants and file proof of service by close of business on September 16, 2014. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 9/15/2014. (Demosthenous, Constantina)
September 12, 2014 Filing 8 Notice of MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Notice of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by David Silver, Lyle Silver. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (Silver, Scott)
September 9, 2014 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Jeffrey Karp, Beth Karp & David Silver Partnership, on 09/09/2014. (Fagan, Linda)
September 9, 2014 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Beth Karp & Lyle Silver Partnership, on 09/09/2014. (Fagan, Linda)
September 9, 2014 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Jeffrey Karp, on 09/09/2014. (Fagan, Linda)
September 9, 2014 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Beth E. Karp, on 09/09/2014. (Fagan, Linda)
September 9, 2014 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Selwyn Karp, on 09/09/2014. (Fagan, Linda)
September 8, 2014 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (McMorrow, Karen)
September 8, 2014 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. The following corrections were made: office code changed from 9 to 2-Central Islip, added party text for all parties, arbitration code changed to blank. (McMorrow, Karen)
September 8, 2014 Case assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. (McMorrow, Karen)
September 5, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-7179892 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Lyle Silver, David Silver. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Selwyn Karp, #3 Proposed Summons Beth E. Karp, #4 Proposed Summons Jeffrey Karp, #5 Proposed Summons Beth Karp & Lyle Silver Partnership, #6 Proposed Summons Jeffrey Karp, Beth Karp & David Silver Partnership) (Silver, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silver et al v. Karp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Scott Silver
Represented By: Judith Rita Cohen
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mitchell
Represented By: Colleen Mary Kilfoyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth E. Karp
Represented By: David I. Rosenberg
Represented By: Anthony Filosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Karp
Represented By: David I. Rosenberg
Represented By: Anthony Filosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Karp, Beth Karp & David Silver Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Karp & Lyle Silver Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Selwyn Karp
Represented By: David I. Rosenberg
Represented By: Anthony Filosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Silver
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mitchell
Represented By: Judith Rita Cohen
Represented By: Colleen Mary Kilfoyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyle Silver
Represented By: Judith Rita Cohen
Represented By: Scott Lance Silver
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mitchell
Represented By: Colleen Mary Kilfoyle
Represented By: Thomas Michael Guiffre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Silver
Represented By: Judith Rita Cohen
Represented By: Scott Lance Silver
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mitchell
Represented By: Colleen Mary Kilfoyle
Represented By: Thomas Michael Guiffre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?