Carroll v. Krumpter et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Carroll
Defendant: Thomas C. Krumpter, Steven E. Skrynecki, Daniel P. Flanagan, Officer Budinilic, John Doe, Nassau County Police Departement and County Of Nassau
Case Number: 2:2015cv01550
Filed: March 25, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Central Islip Office
Presiding Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Referring Judge: Arthur D Spatt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM OF DECISION & ORDER: For the reasons set forth above, the Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is granted with respect to his Fourteenth Amendment procedural due process claim; the remainder of the motion is denied. Further, the Defendants' motion for summary judgment is denied. The Court respectfully refers this case to United States Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay for an inquest into any potential damages stemming from the Plaintiffs Fourteenth Amendment Claim. SEE ATTACHED DECISION for details. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 7/12/2019. (Coleman, Laurie)
December 4, 2018 Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re #43 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and in Reply filed by Andrew Carroll. (Bean, Robert)
November 15, 2018 Filing 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment [PLAINTIFF'S COUNTER-STATEMENT OF FACT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 56.1] by Budinilic, County Of Nassau, Daniel P. Flanagan, Thomas C. Krumpter, Nassau County Police Departement, Steven E. Skrynecki. (Reissman, Ralph)
November 14, 2018 Filing 43 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by Budinilic, County Of Nassau, Daniel P. Flanagan, Thomas C. Krumpter, Nassau County Police Departement, Steven E. Skrynecki. (Attachments: #1 Rule 56.1 Statement, #2 Memorandum in Support) (Reissman, Ralph)
October 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER re #42 Reply in Opposition. On consent of the parties, this revised summary judgment briefing schedule is approved. The Defendants are advised that the Court will not entertain any further extensions of time to file their opposition to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment and cross-motion for summary judgment. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 10/27/2018. (Roberts, Joshua)
October 26, 2018 Filing 42 REPLY in Opposition re #41 Letter and motion to extend time to file opposition and cross-motion, without opposition from plaintiff's counsel, filed by Budinilic, County Of Nassau, Daniel P. Flanagan, Thomas C. Krumpter, Nassau County Police Departement, Steven E. Skrynecki. (Reissman, Ralph)
October 26, 2018 Filing 41 Letter Requesting Decision Without Opposition by Andrew Carroll (Bean, Robert)
September 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER: For administrative purposes, the Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate and immediately restore the Plaintiff's [37,38] motion for summary judgment. The Plaintiff is not required to refile his motion. Furthermore, this does not affect the parties' filing deadlines. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 9/8/2018. (Roberts, Joshua)
July 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER granting #40 Motion for Extension of Time to File. On consent of the parties, this revised summary judgment briefing schedule is approved. Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 07/28/2018. (Roberts, Joshua)
July 27, 2018 Filing 40 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File opposition to summary judgment, and also file cross-motion for summary judgment by Budinilic, County Of Nassau, Daniel P. Flanagan, Thomas C. Krumpter, Nassau County Police Departement, Steven E. Skrynecki. (Reissman, Ralph)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER granting #39 Motion for Extension of Time to File. On consent of the parties, this revised summary judgment briefing schedule is approved. Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 6/5/2018. (Roberts, Joshua)
June 4, 2018 Filing 39 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File opposition to summary judgment motion, and to file cross-motion for summary judgment by Budinilic, County Of Nassau, Daniel P. Flanagan, Thomas C. Krumpter, Nassau County Police Departement, Steven E. Skrynecki. (Reissman, Ralph)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER. For administrative purposes, the Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate and immediately restore the Plaintiff's [37,38] motion for summary judgment. The Plaintiff is not required to refile his motion. Furthermore, this does not affect the parties' filing deadlines. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate [30, 32, 33] as granted. Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 3/1/2018. (Roberts, Joshua)
February 13, 2018 Filing 38 First MOTION for Summary Judgment Memo of Law in Support by Andrew Carroll. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Carroll Declaration, #2 Declaration Bean Declaration, #3 Exhibit OPS 10023, #4 Exhibit PDCN 41, #5 Exhibit Skrynecki Depo, #6 Exhibit Confiscation Data, #7 Exhibit Reissman e-mail, #8 Declaration 2nd Bean Declaration, #9 Exhibit Gisondi Depo, #10 Exhibit Carroll Depo, #11 Exhibit Domestic Incident Rept) (Bean, Robert)
February 13, 2018 Filing 37 First MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice by Andrew Carroll. (Attachments: #1 Rule 56.1 Statement) (Bean, Robert)
December 14, 2017 Filing 36 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Arthur D. Spatt: Civil Cause for Pre-Motion Conference held on 12/14/2017. Case called. Counsel for all sides present. Pre-motion conference held. Settlement discussions held. Case not settled at this time. A briefing schedule was set for plaintiff to move for summary judgment. (Coleman, Laurie)
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re #34 motion to adjourn conference. Application granted. The pre-motion conference is adjourned to 12/14/2017 at 9:00 a.m. Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 11/3/2017. Movant to serve parties by fax. (Coleman, Laurie)
November 3, 2017 Filing 34 Joint MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Budinilic, County Of Nassau, Daniel P. Flanagan, Thomas C. Krumpter, Nassau County Police Departement, Steven E. Skrynecki. (Reissman, Ralph)
November 3, 2017 Filing 33 Cross MOTION for pre motion conference re #32 Supplemental MOTION for pre motion conference re #30 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re Summary Judgment by Budinilic, County Of Nassau, Daniel P. Flanagan, Thomas C. Krumpter, Nassau County Police Departement, Steven E. Skrynecki. (Reissman, Ralph)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER Setting Hearing on #30 Motion for Pre-Motion Conference. An in-person conference has been scheduled before the undersigned for 11/14/2017 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1020 of the Central Islip courthouse. Counsel for all parties shall appear authorized and prepared to discuss settlement at that time. Any requests to adjourn the conference date shall be made in writing on ECF and include at least three proposed alternative dates on which all sides are available. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 10/26/2017. (Roberts, Joshua)
October 25, 2017 Filing 32 Supplemental MOTION for pre motion conference re #30 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re Summary Judgment by Andrew Carroll. (Attachments: #1 Rule 56.1 Statement) (Bean, Robert)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER re #31 : The application to adjourn the deadline for submission of the joint pretrial order until a date after decision on the summary judgment motion is denied. The undersigned believes that the joint pretrial order should be prepared soon after the close of discovery. However, given the anticipated motion, the court will cancel the October 24, 2017 final conference and extend the time to submit the proposed joint pretrial order until February 26, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 10/20/2017. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
October 19, 2017 Filing 31 First MOTION to Adjourn Conference Final Conference by Andrew Carroll. (Bean, Robert)
October 17, 2017 Filing 30 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re Summary Judgment by Andrew Carroll. (Attachments: #1 Rule 56.1 Statement) (Bean, Robert)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #29 ; Application granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 9/5/2017. c/ecf (Miller, Dina)
September 1, 2017 Filing 29 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File [serve Local Rule 56.1 Statement] by Budinilic, County Of Nassau, Daniel P. Flanagan, Thomas C. Krumpter, Nassau County Police Departement, Steven E. Skrynecki. (Reissman, Ralph)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER re #27 , #28 : The Motion to Compel is deemed withdrawn. All discovery is complete. Any party planning on making a dispositive motion must take the first step in the motion process by August 25, 2017. The July 26, 2017 final conference is adjourned to October 24, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. The parties are to electronically file a joint proposed pretrial order in compliance with the district judge's individual rules, signed by counsel for each party, prior to the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 7/18/2017. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
July 17, 2017 Filing 28 First MOTION to Adjourn Conference Final Conference by Andrew Carroll. (Bean, Robert)
June 4, 2017 Filing 27 Second MOTION to Compel Discovery by Andrew Carroll. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit e-mail, #2 Exhibit Letter, #3 Exhibit Letter, #4 Exhibit Notice of Deposition, #5 Exhibit Notice of Deposition, #6 Exhibit Letter) (Bean, Robert)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER re #25 , #26 : The scheduling order is modified as follows: All discovery, inclusive of expert discovery, to be concluded by June 9, 2017. Immediately upon receipt of this Order counsel are directed to schedule the remaining depositions. Any party planning on making a dispositive motion must take the first step in the motion process by June 30, 2017. The May 2, 2017 final conference is adjourned to July 26, 2017 at 11:30 a.m. The parties are to electronically file a joint proposed pretrial order in compliance with the district judge's individual rules, signed by counsel for each party, prior to the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 4/24/2017. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
April 21, 2017 Filing 26 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Budinilic, County Of Nassau, Daniel P. Flanagan, Thomas C. Krumpter, Nassau County Police Departement, Steven E. Skrynecki. (Reissman, Ralph)
April 2, 2017 Filing 25 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Depositions of Defendants by Andrew Carroll. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letters, #2 Exhibit Notice of Depositions) (Bean, Robert)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER re #24 : The scheduling order is modified as follows: All discovery, inclusive of expert discovery, to be concluded by March 31, 2017. Any party planning on making a dispositive motion must take the first step in the motion process by April 14, 2017. The final conference is rescheduled to May 2, 2017 at 11:30 a.m. The parties are to electronically file a joint proposed pretrial order in compliance with the district judge's individual rules, signed by counsel for each party, prior to the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 2/27/2017. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
February 24, 2017 Filing 24 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Andrew Carroll. (Bean, Robert)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER: The final conference previously scheduled for December 19, 2016 is cancelled. The Court will schedule a new date for the final conference via separate order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 12/16/2016. (Lanin, Debbie)
November 2, 2016 Document #21 terminated (Imrie, Robert)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER: Counsel for the Plaintiff has advised that he has an unavoidable conflict on November 9, 2016. Accordingly, the November 9, 2016 Discovery Conference is adjourned to November 30, 2016 at 11:30 a.m. Prior to the rescheduled conference, the parties are directed to submit a joint status letter outlining the remaining discovery disputes. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 11/2/2016. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) Modified on 11/3/2016 (Imrie, Robert).
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER: Due to a change in the Court's calendar the November 3, 2016 conference is adjourned to November 9, 2016 at 2:00 p.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 11/1/2016. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER re #23 : The October 17, 2016 conference is adjourned to November 3, 2016 at 11:30 a.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 10/14/2016. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
October 13, 2016 Filing 23 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Budinilic, County Of Nassau, Daniel P. Flanagan, Thomas C. Krumpter, Nassau County Police Departement, Steven E. Skrynecki. (Reissman, Ralph)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER temporarily denying #21 : See attached order for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 10/5/2016. c/ecf (Miller, Dina)
September 6, 2016 Filing 21 First MOTION for Sanctions for violation of discovery order by Andrew Carroll. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Bean, Robert)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER re #20 : The scheduling order is modified as follows: All discovery, inclusive of expert discovery, to be concluded by November 18, 2016. Any party planning on making a dispositive motion must take the first step in the motion process by December 2, 2016. The October 18, 2016 final conference is adjourned to December 19, 2016 at 11:30 a.m. The parties are to electronically file a joint proposed pretrial order in compliance with the district judge's individual rules, signed by counsel for each party, prior to the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 8/22/2016. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
August 19, 2016 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Budinilic, County Of Nassau, Daniel P. Flanagan, Thomas C. Krumpter, Nassau County Police Departement, Steven E. Skrynecki. (Reissman, Ralph)
August 19, 2016 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Ralph J. Reissman on behalf of Budinilic, County Of Nassau, Daniel P. Flanagan, Thomas C. Krumpter, Nassau County Police Departement, Steven E. Skrynecki (aty to be noticed) (Reissman, Ralph)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #17 : See the attached Order for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 8/1/2016. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER re #16 : Letters between counsel should not be filed with the court.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 7/21/2016. c/ecf (Miller, Dina)
July 20, 2016 Filing 17 Letter MOTION for Discovery by Andrew Carroll. (Bean, Robert)
July 20, 2016 Filing 16 Letter MOTION for Discovery by Andrew Carroll. (Bean, Robert)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for October 18, 2016 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 2/25/2016. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER re #12 ; #14 : The parties have agreed to the dates set forth in the proposed scheduling order. Accordingly, the initial conference is canceled. The scheduling order will be entered by the court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 2/25/2016. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
February 23, 2016 Filing 14 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Andrew Carroll. (Bean, Robert)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Initial Conference ORDER: If counsel cannot agree to the proposed schedule or minor modifications thereof, as attached, they are directed to appear before the undersigned in Courtroom 810, United States Federal Courthouse, Central Islip, New York at the date and time provided in the initial conference order. See attachments for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 2/12/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order) c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
February 9, 2016 Filing 12 Letter MOTION for Hearing Initial Conference by Andrew Carroll. (Bean, Robert)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Denying #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction: PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 11/30/2015. (Ortiz, Grisel)
September 10, 2015 Filing 10 REPLY in Support re #6 Notice of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Andrew Carroll. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration) (Bean, Robert)
September 4, 2015 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 Notice of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Budinilic, County Of Nassau, Daniel P. Flanagan, Thomas C. Krumpter, Nassau County Police Departement, Steven E. Skrynecki. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Petillo, Diane)
June 23, 2015 Filing 8 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Budinilic, County Of Nassau, Daniel P. Flanagan, Thomas C. Krumpter, Nassau County Police Departement, Steven E. Skrynecki. (Petillo, Diane)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File. So ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 6/23/2015.
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order The Defendants are directed to file any papers in response to the Plaintiff's May 15, 2015 motion for a preliminary injunction on or before June 26, 2015. The Plaintiff will then have until July 17, 2015 to file any reply papers. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 6/12/2015.
May 15, 2015 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 Notice of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Andrew Carroll. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Bean, Robert)
May 15, 2015 Filing 6 Notice of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Andrew Carroll. (Bean, Robert)
May 11, 2015 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Budinilic, County Of Nassau, Daniel P. Flanagan, Thomas C. Krumpter, Nassau County Police Departement, Steven E. Skrynecki. (Petillo, Diane)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Arthur D. Spatt as related to 14cv7210 for all further proceedings. Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein no longer assigned to case. Ordered by Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 4/22/2015. (Bowens, Priscilla)
April 10, 2015 Filing 4 Notice of Related Case (Bean, Robert)
March 31, 2015 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 7/30/2015 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, NY, 11722. The parties must appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Notice of Hearing upon defendant(s) and file proof of such service with the Court. (Whipple, Kate)
March 30, 2015 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Cox, Dwayne)
March 25, 2015 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Budinilic, County Of Nassau, Daniel P. Flanagan, Thomas C. Krumpter, Steven E. Skrynecki. (Cox, Dwayne)
March 25, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Andrew Carroll. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cox, Dwayne)
March 25, 2015 FILING FEE: $ 400.00, receipt number 4653086153 (Cox, Dwayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carroll v. Krumpter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Carroll
Represented By: Robert T. Bean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas C. Krumpter
Represented By: Diane C. Petillo
Represented By: Ralph J. Reissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven E. Skrynecki
Represented By: Diane C. Petillo
Represented By: Ralph J. Reissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel P. Flanagan
Represented By: Diane C. Petillo
Represented By: Ralph J. Reissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Budinilic
Represented By: Diane C. Petillo
Represented By: Ralph J. Reissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nassau County Police Departement
Represented By: Diane C. Petillo
Represented By: Ralph J. Reissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County Of Nassau
Represented By: Diane C. Petillo
Represented By: Ralph J. Reissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?