Cincotta v. Hempstead Union Free School District
Plaintiff: Robert Cincotta
Defendant: Hempstead Union Free School District
Case Number: 2:2015cv04821
Filed: August 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Central Islip Office
Presiding Judge: Arthur D. Spatt
Presiding Judge: A. Kathleen Tomlinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MEMORANDUM OF DECISION & ORDER re 70 Motion for Summary Judgment. For the reasons stated above, the Defendants motion is granted in part and denied in part. It is granted to the extent that the Plaintiffs claims for termination based on age discr imination and for discriminatory failure to hire are dismissed, as well as all of the claims against the individual Defendants. The Defendants motion is denied in that the Plaintiffs Monell claim alleging that the Districts decision to terminate him was motivated in part by racial discrimination will be presented to the jury. The official caption is amended to reflect the caption herein. Betty J. Cross, Waylyn Hobbs, Jr., Susan Johnson, Brandon V. Ray, Joann Simmons and Shelley Brazley terminated. SEE ATTACHED DECISION for details. It is SO ORDERED by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 5/14/2018. (Coleman, Laurie)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER denying 48 Motion for Attorney Fees. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 11/29/2016. (Roman, Joshua)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM OF DECISION & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion to Dismiss - For the foregoing reasons, the Defendants motion to dismiss is denied with regard to the Plaintiffs Section 1983 claims and granted with regard to the Plain tiffs NYSHRL claims. Thus, the only remaining claims in this action are the Section 1983 claims. This case is referred to United State Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson for discovery. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate docket entry number 14. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 8/30/2016. (Coleman, Laurie)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cincotta v. Hempstead Union Free School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Cincotta
Represented By: Sean M. O'Hara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hempstead Union Free School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?