GB et al v. Town of Hempstead et al
Plaintiff: GB, HK, JF, MA, MV, NP and PM
Defendant: Nasrin G. Ahmad, Diana Bianculli-Muller, Citizens for Santino, John/Jane Doe Other Entities, John/Jane Doe Republican Organizations, William Muller III, Anthony Santino, Town of Hempstead and Michael Zappolo
Case Number: 2:2017cv06625
Filed: November 13, 2017
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Central Islip Office
Presiding Judge: Arlene R. Lindsay
Presiding Judge: Arthur D. Spatt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1400 Civil Rights of Handicapped Child
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 258 MEMORANDUM & ORDER: Presently before the Court is Plaintiffs motion to amend their complaint. (ECF No. 216 .) The Court presumes familiarity with the background of this case, which is set forth in Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay's February 10, 2025, Report and Recommendation ("R&R") on the instant motion. (See ECF No. 249 .) In the R&R, Judge Lindsay recommended that the Court grant in part and deny in part Plaintiffs' motion. (See ECF No. 249 at 18.) Plaintiffs and the Town Defendants filed timely objections to the R&R. (ECF No. 252 ; ECF No. 253 .) The Court agrees with and adopts Judge Lindsay's analysis and recommendations set forth in the R&R. The parties' objections to the R&R are OVERRULED. The Court ADOPTS the R&R. SEE ATTACHED MEMORANDUM & ORDER for details. So Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 3/6/2025. (LC)
August 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MEMORANDUM & ORDER: On April 22, 2024, Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay issued an Order (the "Discovery Order") that, among other things, denied Plaintiffs' motion to compel Defendants William Muller, III ("Muller") and To wn of Hempstead (the "Town") to submit to forensic examinations of the formers personal email account and the latters computer systems. (ECF No. 201 .) Presently before the Court are Plaintiffs objections to the Discovery Order. (ECF No. 224 .) For the reasons set forth herein, Plaintiffs' objections are OVERRULED. So Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 8/5/2024. (LC) (Main Document 233 replaced on 8/5/2024) (LC).
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MEMORANDUM OF DECISION & ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, the Court overrules the Plaintiffs' objections and adopts the R&R in its entirety. Therefore, the Court denies the motion to disqualify. SEE ATTACHED DECISION for details. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 6/21/2019. (Coleman, Laurie)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GB et al v. Town of Hempstead et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nasrin G. Ahmad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Bianculli-Muller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens for Santino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe Other Entities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe Republican Organizations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Muller III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Santino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Hempstead
Represented By: Angelo R. Bisceglie, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Zappolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GB
Represented By: Christopher J. Benes
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Gold
Represented By: Karen C. Higgins
Represented By: Cynthia A. Kouril
Represented By: Melissa Beth Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HK
Represented By: Christopher J. Benes
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Gold
Represented By: Karen C. Higgins
Represented By: Cynthia A. Kouril
Represented By: Melissa Beth Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JF
Represented By: Christopher J. Benes
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Gold
Represented By: Karen C. Higgins
Represented By: Cynthia A. Kouril
Represented By: Melissa Beth Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MA
Represented By: Christopher J. Benes
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Gold
Represented By: Karen C. Higgins
Represented By: Cynthia A. Kouril
Represented By: Melissa Beth Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MV
Represented By: Christopher J. Benes
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Gold
Represented By: Karen C. Higgins
Represented By: Cynthia A. Kouril
Represented By: Melissa Beth Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NP
Represented By: Christopher J. Benes
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Gold
Represented By: Karen C. Higgins
Represented By: Cynthia A. Kouril
Represented By: Melissa Beth Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PM
Represented By: Christopher J. Benes
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Gold
Represented By: Karen C. Higgins
Represented By: Cynthia A. Kouril
Represented By: Melissa Beth Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?