DiMonda v. Town Board of the Town of Brookhaven et. al.

Plaintiff: Deanna DiMonda
Defendant: Town Board of the Town of Brookhaven and Town of Brookhaven
Case Number: 2:2018cv04431
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: New York Eastern District Court
Office: Central Islip Office
0 Judge: Gary R Brown
1 Judge: Denis R Hurley
2 Judge: Joanna Seybert
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 5, 2018 12 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/22/2018 11:45 AM in Courtroom 840 before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. See order for instructions.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 9/5/2018. (McMorrow, Karen)
September 1, 2018 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deanna DiMonda. Town of Brookhaven served on 8/7/2018, answer due 8/28/2018. (Stern, Fredrick)
September 1, 2018 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deanna DiMonda. Town Board of the Town of Brookhaven served on 8/7/2018, answer due 8/28/2018. (Stern, Fredrick)
August 23, 2018 Email Notification Test - DO NOT REPLY. (Coleman, Laurie)
August 23, 2018 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Lauri, Kenneth)
August 9, 2018 Featured Case ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #5 Motion for Hearing; denying #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction (Docket Entry 7) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and with leave to renew if necessary. Plaintiff has failed to comply with the requirements for motion papers under Local Civil Rule 7.1, which requires that any motions include, among other things, a notice of motion or an order to show cause specifying the relief sought and a memorandum of law. In light of these deficiencies, and the extension granted by the Town to September 9, preliminary relief is not warranted at this time. Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 8/9/2018. (Edwards, Tracy)
August 9, 2018 8 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Declaration of Elisabetta Capizola, Esq. by Deanna DiMonda (Stern, Fredrick)
August 8, 2018 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Joanna Seybert for all further proceedings. Judge Denis R. Hurley no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 8/8/2018. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 8, 2018 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Deanna DiMonda. (Stern, Fredrick)
August 7, 2018 6 Letter in response to 8/7/18 letter by Fredrick P. Stern by Town Board of the Town of Brookhaven, Town of Brookhaven (Attachments: #1 copy of email) (Lauri, Kenneth)
August 7, 2018 5 MOTION for Hearing on Request for Preliminary Injunction by Deanna DiMonda. (Stern, Fredrick)
August 7, 2018 4 Summons Issued as to Town Board of the Town of Brookhaven, Town of Brookhaven. (Flanagan, Doreen)
August 7, 2018 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
August 7, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
August 7, 2018 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
August 7, 2018 Incorrect Document Entry Information. Document Entry No. 1 (Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet and Proposed Summons) was filed as against Plaintiff. Deleted Document Entry No. 1 and re-entered as against all Defendants. (Flanagan, Doreen)
August 6, 2018 FILING FEE: $ 400.00, receipt number 0207-10636369 (Flanagan, Doreen)
August 6, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Deanna DiMonda. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Flanagan, Doreen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DiMonda v. Town Board of the Town of Brookhaven et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town Board of the Town of Brookhaven
Represented By: Kenneth J. Lauri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Brookhaven
Represented By: Kenneth J. Lauri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna DiMonda
Represented By: Fredrick Paul Stern
Represented By: Richard I. Scheyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?