Shannon v. Long Island Rail Road Company

Plaintiff: Gina M. Shannon
Defendant: Long Island Rail Road Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv04533
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Central Islip Office
Presiding Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Referring Judge: Arthur D Spatt
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Initial Conference ORDER: If counsel cannot agree to the proposed schedule or minor modifications thereof, as attached, they are directed to appear before the undersigned in Courtroom 810, United States Federal Courthouse, Central Islip, New York at the date and time provided in the initial conference order. See attachments for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 10/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order) /ecf (Imrie, Robert)
October 2, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Long Island Rail Road Company. (Chiofolo, Thomas)
October 2, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Long Island Rail Road Company identifying Corporate Parent Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Other Affiliate MTA Bridges and Tunnels, Other Affiliate MTA Metro-North Commuter Railroad, Other Affiliate MTA New York City Transit, Other Affiliate MTA Staten Island Railway, Other Affiliate MTA Capital Construction, Other Affiliate MTA Bus Company for Long Island Rail Road Company. (Chiofolo, Thomas)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER re #5 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer. The Defendant shall file a responsive pleading no later than October 1, 2018.So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 8/31/2018. (Kanellopoulos, Paul)
August 30, 2018 Filing 5 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer by Long Island Rail Road Company (Yodice, Christopher)
August 29, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gina M. Shannon. Long Island Rail Road Company served on 8/21/2018, answer due 9/11/2018. (Lauriello, Valerie)
August 10, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Long Island Rail Road Company. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 10, 2018 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 10, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Arthur D. Spatt and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 10, 2018 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Long Island Rail Road Company filing fee $400, receipt number 0207-10648410, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by Long Island Rail Road Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lauriello, Valerie) Modified on 8/10/2018 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shannon v. Long Island Rail Road Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina M. Shannon
Represented By: Valerie J. Lauriello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Island Rail Road Company
Represented By: Thomas L. Chiofolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?