Visions In Learning Inc. et al v. Verity, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Visions In Learning Inc. and Feed the Starving Children LLC
Defendant: Verity, Inc., Adam Reiser, XYZ Entities 1-10 and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2018cv05042
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bianco
Referring Judge: Steven I Locke
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 REQUEST for Certificate of Default #8 is denied at this time. The affidavit in support of #8 Request for Certificate of Default does not demonstrate, as required by Local Civil Rule 55.1(b)(3), that the defendants were properly served. (Toritto, Jim)
October 26, 2018 Filing 8 Request for Certificate of Default by Feed the Starving Children LLC, Visions In Learning Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Dovid Abrahamson in Support of Request for Certificate of Default, #2 Proposed Certificate of Default) (Ershowsky, Michael)
October 3, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Visions In Learning Inc., Feed the Starving Children LLC. Adam Reiser served on 10/1/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Ershowsky, Michael)
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Visions In Learning Inc., Feed the Starving Children LLC. Verity, Inc. served on 10/1/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Ershowsky, Michael)
September 7, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Adam Reiser, Verity, Inc. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 7, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Joseph F. Bianco and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 6, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Feed the Starving Children LLC, Visions In Learning Inc. (Ershowsky, Michael) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/7/2018) (Davis, Kimberly). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/7/2018: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Kimberly).
September 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Verity, Inc., Adam Reiser, XYZ Entities 1-10 and John Does 1-10 filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10707185 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Visions In Learning Inc., Feed the Starving Children LLC. (Ershowsky, Michael) Modified on 9/7/2018 (Davis, Kimberly).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Visions In Learning Inc. et al v. Verity, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verity, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Reiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Visions In Learning Inc.
Represented By: Michael B. Ershowsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Feed the Starving Children LLC
Represented By: Michael B. Ershowsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?