Mount Sinai Child Care, Inc. v. The Learning Experience Systems, LLC

Plaintiff: Mount Sinai Child Care, Inc.
Defendant: The Learning Experience Systems LLC and The Learning Experience Systems, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv05146
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bianco
Referring Judge: A Kathleen Tomlinson
Nature of Suit: Contract:Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DISMISSING CASE voluntarily without prejudice. The clerk of the court shall close the case.Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 10/9/2018. (Bollbach, Jean)
October 9, 2018 Filing 13 Letter dtd 10/9/18 from Mr Siegel to Judge Bianco RE: plaintiff has decided to file a notice of dismissal making motion practice moot. (Bollbach, Jean)
October 9, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mount Sinai Child Care, Inc. (Bollbach, Jean)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER. On September 21, 2018, the Court held a pre-motion conference with the parties and set a briefing schedule for defendant's motion to transfer. Defendant filed its motion on September 25, 2018. The Court has not received plaintiff's opposition, which was due on October 2, 2018. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that counsel for plaintiff shall submit a letter to the Court by Tuesday, October 9, 2018, addressing why it hasn't opposed defendant's motion. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 10/5/2018. (Kuhn, Alyssa)
September 25, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Change Venue by The Learning Experience Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue, #2 Declaration of Jason H. Kislin in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D) (Kislin, Jason)
September 21, 2018 Filing 10 STATE COURT RECORD received - see list attached (Bollbach, Jean)
September 21, 2018 Filing 9 Letter dtd 9/21/18 from Mr Siegel to Judge Bianco RE: in response to letter dtd 9/13/18 re: pre motion conf (Bollbach, Jean)
September 21, 2018 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph F. Bianco:Telephone Conference held on 9/21/2018, MOTION SHALL BE FILED BY 9/25/18 OPPOSITION SHALL BE FILED BY 10/2/18 REPLY SHALL BE FILED BY 10/6/18 ( oral argument set for 10/11/2018 04:30 PM in Courtroom 1040 before Judge Joseph F. Bianco.) (FTR Log #2:38-2:54.) (Bollbach, Jean)
September 19, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Van Nostrand on behalf of The Learning Experience Systems, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Van Nostrand, Aaron)
September 19, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION re #1 Notice of Removal, Certification of Service by The Learning Experience Systems, LLC (Demais, Jaclyn)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: By letter dated September 13, 2018, counsel for defendant requests a pre-motion conference in anticipation of moving to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Florida. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall participate in a pre-motion conference with the Court on Friday, September 21, 2018, at 2:30 p.m. At the time of the conference, counsel for defendant shall initiate the call and, once all parties are on the line, shall contact Chambers at (631) 712-5670. Prior to the date of the conference, plaintiff may submit a letter pursuant to Individual Rule III.A explaining why the proposed motion is likely to be unsuccessful. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 9/18/2018. (Kuhn, Alyssa)
September 13, 2018 Filing 5 Letter Letter Requesting Pre-Motion Conference by The Learning Experience Systems, LLC (Kislin, Jason)
September 13, 2018 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 13, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Joseph F. Bianco and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 13, 2018 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 12, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaclyn Demais on behalf of The Learning Experience Systems LLC (aty to be noticed) (Demais, Jaclyn)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Learning Experience Systems LLC from the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Suffolk. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0207-10723309) Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kislin, Jason) Modified on 9/13/2018 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mount Sinai Child Care, Inc. v. The Learning Experience Systems, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Learning Experience Systems LLC
Represented By: Jason Harris Kislin
Represented By: Jaclyn Demais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Learning Experience Systems, LLC
Represented By: Jason Harris Kislin
Represented By: Jaclyn Demais
Represented By: Aaron Van Nostrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mount Sinai Child Care, Inc.
Represented By: Steven S. Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?