United States of America v. Knightsbridge Construction Corp. et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Knightsbridge Construction Corp. and The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv05245
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary R Brown
Referring Judge: Joanna Seybert
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application granted. Defendants shall have until, and including, November 20, 2018, to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 11/7/2018. c/ecf (Gilpin, Daniel)
November 6, 2018 Filing 9 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Knightsbridge Construction Corp.. (Mignardi, David)
October 12, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. (Pallaci, Vincent)
October 12, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Knightsbridge Construction Corp. served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. (Pallaci, Vincent)
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Knightsbridge Construction Corp., The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. (Valle, Christine)
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by United States of America (Pallaci, Vincent)
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 18, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 18, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by United States of America. (Pallaci, Vincent) Modified on 9/18/2018 (Rodin, Deanna).
September 18, 2018 A completed Civil Cover Sheet was not filed; the Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is directed to submit the Civil Cover Sheet using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Flanagan, Doreen)
September 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $400, receipt number 0207-10736157, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to complaint) (Pallaci, Vincent) Modified on 9/18/2018 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Knightsbridge Construction Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knightsbridge Construction Corp.
Represented By: David Vincent Mignardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Vincent T. Pallaci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?