Carone v. Long Island Rail Road Company

Plaintiff: Carlo A. Carone
Defendant: Long Island Rail Road Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv05400
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denis R Hurley
Referring Judge: A Kathleen Tomlinson
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Long Island Rail Road Company identifying Corporate Parent Metropolitan Tranportation Authority, Other Affiliate MTA New York City Transit, Other Affiliate MTA Staten Island Railway, Other Affiliate MTA Capital Construction, Other Affiliate MTA Bus Company, Other Affiliate MTA Bridges and Tunnels, Other Affiliate MTA Metro North Commuter Railroad for Long Island Rail Road Company. (Yodice, Christopher)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for December 13, 2018 at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson in Courtroom 910 at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York. No later than two business days before the Initial Conference, counsel for the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF system, a Joint Proposed Discovery Plan. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for additional details.Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 10/17/2018. (Degennaro, Christopher)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Long Island Rail Road Company. (Yodice, Christopher)
September 28, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlo A. Carone. Long Island Rail Road Company served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018. (Lauriello, Valerie)
September 26, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Long Island Rail Road Company. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 26, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Long Island Rail Road Company filing fee $400, receipt number 0207-10754936, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by Carlo A. Carone. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Lauriello, Valerie) Modified on 9/26/2018 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carone v. Long Island Rail Road Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlo A. Carone
Represented By: Valerie J. Lauriello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Island Rail Road Company
Represented By: Christopher P. Yodice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?