United States of America v. Forty-Three Thousand One Hundred Forty-Six Dollars and Zero Cents ($43,146.00)
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Forty-Three Thousand One Hundred forty-Six Dollars and Zero Cents ($43,146.00)
Case Number: 2:2018cv05490
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denis R Hurley
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Filing 4 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN re #3 Order for Warrant of Arrest of Articles in REM returned executed by the U.S. Marshals Service for Richard P. Donoghue-USA, 610 Federal Plaza 5th Floor Central Islip, NY 11722, ATTN: Brian Gappa. Special Instructions: Please arrange to execute the warrant and transfer the funds on deposit to a Judicial action. The funds shall remain in the seized deposit asset fund, pending further order of the court; Return receipt requested 18-DEA-638809. Date of Service: 10/11/2018. Remarks: $43,146.00 transferred to Judicial action on 10/11/2018. (Cubano, Jazmin)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem: YOU ARE THEREFORE HEREBY COMMANDED to arrest and seize the Defendant Funds and use discretion and whatever means appropriate to protect and maintain the Defendant Funds; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States Attorney's Office ("USAO''), the United States Marshals Service ("USMS11) and/or the Drug Enforcement Administration("DEA"), or their authorized agents, representatives and/or contractors shall serve upon all potential claimants to the Defendant Funds a copy of this Warrant and the Verified Complaint In Rem in a manner consistent with the principles of service of process of an action bi rem under the Supplemental Rules, and the Federal Rules of Civil Proced~ and publish notice of the action on the government website, www.forfeiture.gov, in accordance with the customs and practice of this district, and pursuant to Supplemental Rule G(4); and IT IS FURrnER ORDERED that a return of this Wurant shall be promptly made to the Court identifying the individuals upon whom copies were served and the manner employed; See attached Order. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 10/3/2018. (Cubano, Jazmin)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by United States of America. (Cox, Dwayne)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Forty-Three Thousand One Hundred Forty-Six Dollars and Zero Cents ($43,146.00) Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cox, Dwayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Forty-Three Thousand One Hundred Forty-Six Dollars and Zero Cents ($43,146.00)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forty-Three Thousand One Hundred forty-Six Dollars and Zero Cents ($43,146.00)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Madeline M. O'Connor
Represented By: Richard P. Donoghue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?