Schortemeyer v. Long Island Rail Road Company

Plaintiff: Robert Schortemeyer
Defendant: Long Island Rail Road Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv05565
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sandra J Feuerstein
Referring Judge: A Kathleen Tomlinson
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held on 11/13/2018 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein: Civil Cause for Status Conference. Counsel for Plaintiff: Valeria Lauriello. Counsel for Defendant: Christopher Yodice. Case called. A status conference is scheduled for 1/8/2019 at 11:15AM before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein in Courtroom 1010. (Tirado, Chelsea)
November 9, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Due to a change in the Court's calendar, the conference scheduled before Judge Feuerstein on 11/13/2018 is advanced to 10:00 am. c/ecf (Morabito, Bryan)
October 24, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Long Island Rail Road Company. (Yodice, Christopher)
October 24, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Long Island Rail Road Company identifying Corporate Parent Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Other Affiliate MTA New York City Transit, Other Affiliate MTA Staten Island Railway, Other Affiliate MTA Capital Construction, Other Affiliate MTA Bus Company, Other Affiliate MTA Bridges and Tunnels, Other Affiliate MTA Metro North Commuter Railroad for Long Island Rail Road Company. (Yodice, Christopher)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Initial Conference scheduled to be held before the undersigned on 2/5/2019 is advanced to 11/13/2018 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 at the Central Islip Courthouse. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order upon defendant and file proof of such service with the Court. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 10/9/2018. c/ECF (Adell, April)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Schortemeyer. Long Island Rail Road Company served on 10/5/2018, answer due 10/26/2018. (Lauriello, Valerie)
October 5, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 2/5/2019 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Federal Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiff(s) shall serve a copy of this Notice of Hearing upon Defendant(s) and file proof of such service with the Court. c/ECF (Killigrew, Patricia)
October 4, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Long Island Rail Road Company. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 4, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 4, 2018 Incorrect Document Entry Information. Attorney attached the wrong documents; attorney emailed correct documents and clerk's office replaced them on the docket sheet. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Long Island Rail Road Company filing fee $400, receipt number 0207-10778307, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by Robert Schortemeyer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Lauriello, Valerie) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/4/2018) (Rodin, Deanna). (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/4/2018) (Rodin, Deanna). (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/4/2018) (Rodin, Deanna). Modified on 10/4/2018 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schortemeyer v. Long Island Rail Road Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Schortemeyer
Represented By: Valerie J. Lauriello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Island Rail Road Company
Represented By: Christopher P. Yodice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?