Lash v. GPB Capital Holdings, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Jeffrey Lash
Defendant: David Gentile, GPB Holdings Automotive, LLC, GPB Holdings, LP, Prime Motor Group LLC, GPB Automotive Portfolio LP, David Rosenberg, GPB Capital Holdings, LLC and GPB Portfolio Automotive, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv05622
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
0 Judge: Denis R Hurley
1 Judge: A Kathleen Tomlinson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jeffrey Lash (Slossberg, David)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply : The application is granted. Plaintiff shall file its response to the Court's Order to Show Cause on or before November 9, 2018. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 10/26/2018. (Gapinski, Michele)
October 25, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 Order to Show Cause, by Jeffrey Lash. (Slossberg, David)
October 12, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to David Gentile, Prime Motor Group LLC, David Rosenberg. (Cubano, Jazmin)
October 11, 2018 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Jeffrey Lash (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Order) (Slossberg, David)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #1 Complaint, filed by Jeffrey Lash. Show Cause Response due by 10/26/2018: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiff show cause in writing filed on or before October 26, 2018, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 10/11/2018. (Gapinski, Michele)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to GPB Automotive Portfolio LP, GPB Capital Holdings, LLC, GPB Holdings Automotive, LLC, GPB Holdings, LP, GPB Portfolio Automotive, LLC. (Cubano, Jazmin)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Jeffrey Lash (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons) (Slossberg, David)
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 10, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/10/2018: #1 Additional Corrections) (Rodin, Deanna).
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $400, receipt number ANYEDC-10799816, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by Jeffrey Lash. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Slossberg, David) Modified on 10/10/2018 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lash v. GPB Capital Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Gentile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GPB Holdings Automotive, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GPB Holdings, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Motor Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GPB Automotive Portfolio LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GPB Capital Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GPB Portfolio Automotive, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Lash
Represented By: David Andrew Slossberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?