Shencavitz v. Sugimoto
Plaintiff: ROBERT SHENCAVITZ
Defendant: YUJI SUGIMOTO
Case Number: 2:2018cv05687
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bianco
Referring Judge: A Kathleen Tomlinson
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Filing 8 Notice of Related Case indicated on the Civil Cover Sheet in Case No. 18-cv-06828. (Flanagan, Doreen)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for January 4, 2019 at 10 a.m. before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson in Courtroom 910 at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York. No later than two business days before the Initial Conference, counsel for the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF system, a Joint Proposed Discovery Plan. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for additional details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 11/21/2018. (Cento, Patrick)
October 26, 2018 Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORD received - see list attached (Bollbach, Jean)
October 17, 2018 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Robert Shencavitz (Hake, Jason)
October 12, 2018 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 12, 2018 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 12, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Joseph F. Bianco and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by YUJI SUGIMOTO. (Federici, Joseph)
October 11, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Yuji Sugimoto from Suffolk County, case number 617797/2018. (Filing fee $400 receipt number BNYEDC-10819629) Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Federici, Joseph) Modified on 10/12/2018 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shencavitz v. Sugimoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YUJI SUGIMOTO
Represented By: Joseph Robert Federici, Jr.
Represented By: James Edward Mercante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT SHENCAVITZ
Represented By: Jason W. Hake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?