Damiano v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et. al.
Plaintiff: Vincent Damiano, Jr.
Defendant: Adminstrator of the United States of America Small Business Adminstration, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association as trustee for Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-8, dated Recorded in Liber 21957 MP 854 and Adminstrator of the United States of America Small Business Administration
Case Number: 2:2018cv06280
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denis R Hurley
Referring Judge: Steven I Locke
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER granting DE #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. On consent, the time for Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., to answer or otherwise respond is extended to and including 1/28/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 12/7/2018. (Vissichelli, Eric)
December 6, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association as trustee for Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-8, dated 6/01/2010 Recorded 6/21/2010 in Liber 21957 MP 854. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Turetsky, Brian)
November 28, 2018 Filing 9 STATE COURT RECORD Received from Judith Pascale, Suffolk County Clerk, Index No. 619091/18. Since the above mentioned case is E-filed, there are no hard copies of the documents listed on the Civil Court Minutes Report. (Florio, Lisa)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER granting DE #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. On consent, the time for Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., and U.S. Bank National Association to answer or otherwise respond is extended to and including 12/13/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 11/13/2018. (Vissichelli, Eric)
November 12, 2018 Filing 8 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer With Consent of Plaintiff and stipulation extending time by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association as trustee for Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-8, dated 6/01/2010 Recorded 6/21/2010 in Liber 21957 MP 854. (Parker, Scott)
November 6, 2018 Filing 7 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
November 6, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
November 6, 2018 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association as trustee for Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-8, dated 6/01/2010 Recorded 6/21/2010 in Liber 21957 MP 854 re #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal,, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Parker, Scott)
November 5, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. Bank National Association as trustee for Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-8, dated 6/01/2010 Recorded 6/21/2010 in Liber 21957 MP 854 identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank National Association as trustee for Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-8, dated 6/01/2010 Recorded 6/21/2010 in Liber 21957 MP 854. (Parker, Scott)
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent MERSCORP Holdings, Inc. for Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Parker, Scott)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Parker, Scott)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association as trustee for Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-8, dated 6/01/2010 Recorded 6/21/2010 in Liber 21957 MP 854 from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Suffolk, Case Number 619091/2018. Was the Disclosure Statement on the Civil Cover Sheet completed - Yes. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-10908506) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Damiano Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Service on Chase) (Parker, Scott) Modified on 11/6/2018 (Flanagan, Doreen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Damiano v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adminstrator of the United States of America Small Business Adminstration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Scott W. Parker
Represented By: Brian Alexander Turetsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Scott W. Parker
Represented By: Brian Alexander Turetsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association as trustee for Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-8, dated Recorded in Liber 21957 MP 854
Represented By: Scott W. Parker
Represented By: Brian Alexander Turetsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adminstrator of the United States of America Small Business Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Damiano, Jr.
Represented By: Michael E. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?