Griffith v. Brainworks Software, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Matt Griffith
Defendant: John Barry and Brainworks Software, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv06391
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: New York Eastern District Court
0 Judge: Steven I Locke
1 Judge: Joanna Seybert
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2018 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Barry. John Barry waiver sent on 11/20/2018, answer due 1/21/2019. (Sweeney, Brendan)
November 21, 2018 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brainworks Software, LLC. Brainworks Software, LLC waiver sent on 11/20/2018, answer due 1/21/2019. (Sweeney, Brendan)
November 14, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan Sweeney on behalf of John Barry, Brainworks Software, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Sweeney, Brendan)
November 14, 2018 Featured Case Electronic ORDER granting DE #5 Motion to Seal Document. The joint request to seal DE [1-1] is granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to seal DE [1-1]. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 11/14/2018. (Kantor, Jesse)
November 13, 2018 5 Joint MOTION to Seal Document by Matt Griffith. (Panagopoulou Alexandrou, Ariadne)
November 13, 2018 4 Summons Issued as to John Barry, Brainworks Software, LLC. (Rodin, Deanna)
November 13, 2018 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
November 13, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
November 13, 2018 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2018: #1 Additional Corrections) (Rodin, Deanna).
November 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against John Barry, Brainworks Software, LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-10925293 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Matt Griffith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Spreadsheet outlining unpaid commissions, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Panagopoulou Alexandrou, Ariadne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffith v. Brainworks Software, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Barry
Represented By: Brendan Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brainworks Software, LLC
Represented By: Brendan Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Griffith
Represented By: Ariadne Anna Panagopoulou Alexandrou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?