Garrett v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company et. al.
Plaintiff: Stefanie Garrett
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company and Kevin Burtch
Case Number: 2:2018cv06576
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sandra J Feuerstein
Referring Judge: Anne Y Shields
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by William H Ng on behalf of Kevin Burtch, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Ng, William)
December 6, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Natalie Dobson on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Dobson, Kimberly)
November 29, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stefanie Garrett. Kevin Burtch waiver sent on 11/26/2018, answer due 1/25/2019; Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company waiver sent on 11/26/2018, answer due 1/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Waiver (Burtch)) (Leonard, Shelly)
November 20, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 3/20/2019 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiff(s) shall serve a copy of this Notice of Hearing upon defendant(s) and file proof of such service with the Court. c/ECF. (Disbrow, Sandra)
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Kevin Burtch, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons-Kevin Burtch) (Flanagan, Doreen)
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. by Stefanie Garrett (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Leonard, Shelly)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Stefanie Garrett (Leonard, Shelly)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kevin Burtch, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-10949025 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed - No,, filed by Stefanie Garrett. (Leonard, Shelly) Modified on 11/19/2018 (Flanagan, Doreen).
November 19, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrett v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Kimberly Natalie Dobson
Represented By: William H Ng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Burtch
Represented By: Kimberly Natalie Dobson
Represented By: William H Ng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stefanie Garrett
Represented By: Shelly A. Leonard
Represented By: Steven Bennett Blau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?