Gesualdi et. al. v. Amanda Carting Corp. et. al.
Plaintiff: Louis Bisignano, Frank H. Finkel, Michael Bourgal, Denise Richardson, Michael O'Toole, Marc Herbst, Thomas Gesualdi, Thomas Corbett, Darin Jeffers and Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr.
Defendant: Breeze National Inc., Amanda Carting Corp., Breeze Contracting Corp. and Breeze Carting Corp.
Case Number: 2:2018cv06981
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Filing 13 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT: It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Amanda Carting Corp., has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Amanda Carting Corp., is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Toritto, Jim)
January 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard B. Ziskin on behalf of Breeze Carting Corp., Breeze Contracting Corp., Breeze National Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Ziskin, Richard)
January 23, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Certificate of Default by Louis Bisignano, Michael Bourgal, Thomas Corbett, Frank H. Finkel, Thomas Gesualdi, Marc Herbst, Darin Jeffers, Michael O'Toole, Denise Richardson (Attachments: #1 Declaration Christopher A. Smith, #2 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Service) (Smith, Christopher)
January 9, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Frank H. Finkel, Darin Jeffers, Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Denise Richardson, Louis Bisignano, Marc Herbst, Thomas Gesualdi, Michael O'Toole, Thomas Corbett, Michael Bourgal. Amanda Carting Corp. served on 12/21/2018, answer due 1/11/2019. (Muller, Arthur)
January 2, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Frank H. Finkel, Darin Jeffers, Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Denise Richardson, Louis Bisignano, Marc Herbst, Thomas Gesualdi, Michael O'Toole, Thomas Corbett, Michael Bourgal. Breeze Contracting Corp. waiver sent on 12/19/2018, answer due 2/18/2019. (Muller, Arthur)
January 2, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Frank H. Finkel, Darin Jeffers, Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Denise Richardson, Louis Bisignano, Marc Herbst, Thomas Gesualdi, Michael O'Toole, Thomas Corbett, Michael Bourgal. Breeze National Inc. waiver sent on 12/19/2018, answer due 2/18/2019. (Muller, Arthur)
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Frank H. Finkel, Darin Jeffers, Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Denise Richardson, Louis Bisignano, Marc Herbst, Thomas Gesualdi, Michael O'Toole, Thomas Corbett, Michael Bourgal. Breeze Carting Corp. waiver sent on 12/19/2018, answer due 2/18/2019. (Muller, Arthur)
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint,, by Louis Bisignano, Michael Bourgal, Thomas Corbett, Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Frank H. Finkel, Thomas Gesualdi, Marc Herbst, Darin Jeffers, Michael O'Toole, Denise Richardson (Muller, Arthur)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Louis Bisignano, Michael Bourgal, Thomas Corbett, Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Frank H. Finkel, Thomas Gesualdi, Marc Herbst, Darin Jeffers, Michael O'Toole, Denise Richardson (Muller, Arthur)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons-Breeze National Inc., #2 Summons-Breeze Contracting Corp., #3 Summons-Breeze Carting Corp.) (Flanagan, Doreen)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
December 10, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amanda Carting Corp., Breeze Carting Corp., Breeze Contracting Corp., Breeze National Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11003519 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed - Yes,, filed by Frank H. Finkel, Darin Jeffers, Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Denise Richardson, Louis Bisignano, Marc Herbst, Thomas Gesualdi, Michael O'Toole, Thomas Corbett, Michael Bourgal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons - Amanda Carting Corp., #2 Proposed Summons - Breeze National Inc., #3 Proposed Summons - Breeze Contracting Corp., #4 Proposed Summons - Breeze Carting Corp., #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Muller, Arthur) Modified on 12/10/2018 (Flanagan, Doreen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gesualdi et. al. v. Amanda Carting Corp. et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breeze National Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. Ziskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Carting Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breeze Contracting Corp.
Represented By: Richard B. Ziskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breeze Carting Corp.
Represented By: Richard B. Ziskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Bisignano
Represented By: Arthur Joseph Muller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank H. Finkel
Represented By: Arthur Joseph Muller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bourgal
Represented By: Arthur Joseph Muller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Richardson
Represented By: Arthur Joseph Muller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael O'Toole
Represented By: Arthur Joseph Muller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Herbst
Represented By: Arthur Joseph Muller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Gesualdi
Represented By: Arthur Joseph Muller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Corbett
Represented By: Arthur Joseph Muller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darin Jeffers
Represented By: Arthur Joseph Muller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr.
Represented By: Arthur Joseph Muller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?