Maltese et al v. Brunswick Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Faryn Weinstein Maltese and Albert Maltese
Defendant: Marinemax of NY, Inc., Brunswick Corporation, Marinemax Services, Inc., MarineMax Northeast, LLC and Marinemax, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv07244
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
0 Judge: Joan M Azrack
1 Judge: A Kathleen Tomlinson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Faryn Weinstein Maltese. Marinemax, Inc. served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. (Golomb, David)
February 14, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Faryn Weinstein Maltese. Marinemax of NY, Inc. served on 1/18/2019, answer due 2/8/2019. (Golomb, David)
February 14, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Faryn Weinstein Maltese. Marinemax Services, Inc. served on 1/11/2019, answer due 2/1/2019. (Golomb, David)
February 14, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Faryn Weinstein Maltese. Brunswick Corporation served on 1/18/2019, answer due 2/8/2019. (Golomb, David)
February 14, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Faryn Weinstein Maltese. MarineMax Northeast, LLC served on 1/11/2019, answer due 2/1/2019. (Golomb, David)
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Faryn Weinstein Maltese as to Brunswick Corporation. (Golomb, David)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 3/6/2019 at 12:00 PM before Judge Joan M. Azrack in Courtroom 920 of the Long Island Courthouse.Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 2/14/2019. (Posillico, Lauren)
January 31, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brunswick Corporation, MarineMax Northeast, LLC, Marinemax, Inc. re #5 Answer to Complaint (Rutherford, David)
January 31, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Brunswick Corporation, MarineMax Northeast, LLC, Marinemax, Inc.. (Rutherford, David)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Corsini, Alexander)
December 26, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Corsini, Alexander)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/26/2018: #1 Attachment) (Corsini, Alexander).
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Corsini, Alexander)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11046044 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Faryn Weinstein Maltese, Albert Maltese. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Golomb, David) Modified on 12/26/2018 (Corsini, Alexander).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maltese et al v. Brunswick Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marinemax of NY, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brunswick Corporation
Represented By: David Scott Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marinemax Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MarineMax Northeast, LLC
Represented By: David Scott Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marinemax, Inc.
Represented By: David Scott Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faryn Weinstein Maltese
Represented By: David B. Golomb
Represented By: Frank A. Longo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Maltese
Represented By: David B. Golomb
Represented By: Frank A. Longo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?