Flanders v. Metropolitan Transportation Authority et al

Plaintiff: Justin Flanders
Defendant: Long Island Rail Road, Metropolitan Transportation Authority and Long Island Railroad Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00294
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
0 Judge: Ramon E Reyes
1 Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 10 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Florio, Lisa)
March 8, 2019 Case randomly reassigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Judge Joseph F. Bianco, Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Florio, Lisa)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for April 3, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson in Courtroom 910 at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York. No later than two business days before the Initial Conference, counsel for the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF system, a Joint Proposed Discovery Plan. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for additional details.Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 2/27/2019. (Degennaro, Christopher)
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Justin Flanders. Long Island Railroad Company served on 1/30/2019, answer due 2/20/2019. (Greenberg, Cary)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Justin Flanders. Metropolitan Transportation Authority served on 1/30/2019, answer due 2/20/2019. (Greenberg, Cary)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by All Defendants. (Hechtkopf, Helene)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Amory Winslow McAndrew on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (McAndrew, Amory)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Long Island Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Rodin, Deanna)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
January 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joseph F. Bianco and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
January 16, 2019 Incorrect Document Entry Information. Defendant was added to the case incorrectly; document entry 1 was deleted and re-entered against corrected defendant. (Rodin, Deanna)
January 15, 2019 FILING FEE: $400, receipt number ANYEDC-11107330 (Rodin, Deanna)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Long Island Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Justin Flanders. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons) (Rodin, Deanna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flanders v. Metropolitan Transportation Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Flanders
Represented By: Cary M. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Island Rail Road
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Transportation Authority
Represented By: Amory Winslow McAndrew
Represented By: Helene R Hechtkopf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Island Railroad Company
Represented By: Amory Winslow McAndrew
Represented By: Helene R Hechtkopf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?