United States of America v. Forty Thousand Five Hundred Thirty Dollars and Zero Cents ($40,530.00)
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Forty Thousand Five Hundred Thirty Dollars and Zero Cents ($40,530.00)
Case Number: 2:2019cv00801
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sandra J Feuerstein
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 CLAIM Opposing Forfeiture by Forty Thousand Five Hundred Thirty Dollars and Zero Cents ($40,530.00). (Cassar, Christopher)
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Joseph Cassar on behalf of Forty Thousand Five Hundred Thirty Dollars and Zero Cents ($40,530.00) (notification declined or already on case) (Cassar, Christopher)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN re: #2 WARRANT FOR ARREST OF ARTICLES IN REM returned executed by the U.S. Marshals Service for Richard P. Donoghue-USA, Eastern District of New York 610 Federal Plaza 5th Floor Central Islip, N.Y. 11722 Attn: Brian Gappa; Special Instructions: Please arrange to execute the warrant in rem and transfer the United States currency to a Judicial action. Return receipt Requested. 18-DEA-643269. Date of Service: February 28, 2019; Remarks: $40,530.00 transferred to Judicial action on February 28, 2019. (Cubano, Jazmin)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 WARRANT FOR ARREST OF ARTICLES IN REM - YOU ARE THEREFORE HEREBY COMMANDED to arrest and seize the Defendant Funds and use discretion and whatever means appropriate to protect and maintain the Defendant Funds; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States Attorney's Office ("USAO"), the USMS and/or the DEA, or their authorized agents, representatives and/or contractors shall serve upon all potential claimants to the Defendant Funds a copy of this Warrant and the Verified Complaint In Rem in a manner consistent with the principles of service of process of an action in rem under the Supplemental Rules, and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and publish notice of this action on the government website, www.forfeiture.gov, in accordance with the customs and practice of this district, pursuant to Supplemental Rule G(4); and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a return of this Warrant shall be promptly made to the Court identifying the individuals upon whom copies were served and the manner employed. SO Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 2/13/2019. (Tirado, Chelsea)
February 12, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 6/11/2019 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Notice of Hearing upon all potential claimants and file proof of such service with the Court. c/ECF (Adell, April)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Forty Thousand Five Hundred Thirty Dollars and Zero Cents ($40,530.00) Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cox, Dwayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Forty Thousand Five Hundred Thirty Dollars and Zero Cents ($40,530.00)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forty Thousand Five Hundred Thirty Dollars and Zero Cents ($40,530.00)
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Cassar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Diane C. Leonardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?