Mosquera v. Nassau Health Care Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Valentino Mosquera
Defendant: Dr. Montero, Nassau County Correctional Center, Dr. Donna Henig, Nassau Health Care Corporation, Dr. Michel Long, Raybrook F.C.I, Correctional Health Services and Nassau County Correctional Sherrif Department
Case Number: 2:2019cv00853
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Robert M Levy
2 Judge: Roslynn R Mauskopf
3 Judge: Anne Y Shields
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 9 Letter dated 4/12/2019 to Warden from Clerk of Court furnishing signed copy of prisoner authorization and requesting copies of plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and disbursement of payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. (Lee, Tiffeny)
April 5, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Judge Joan M. Azrack, Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Motions referred to Robert M. Levy. (Mahoney, Brenna)
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Valentino Mosquera. (Ortiz, Grisel)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 Prisoner Authorization Form, by Valentino Mosquera dated 3/1/2019. (Ortiz, Grisel)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Pro Se Office to Pro Se Litigant dated 2/26/2019 Re: Response to #5 Letter. (Ortiz, Grisel)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Pro Se Litigant dated 2/20/2019 Re: #2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT FILING. (Ortiz, Grisel)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from Pro Se Office to Pro Se Litigant dated 2/14/2019 Re: This letter acknowledges receipt of your civil action(s). (Ortiz, Grisel)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Cox, Dwayne)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT FILING, litigant notified of deficiency(s) that must be corrected within fourteen (14) days. re: #1 Complaint. The papers are deficient as a filing fee of $400 is required to commence a civil action. Alternatively, you may request to waive the filing fee by completing an IFP application. You must also complete the Prisoner Authorization form along with the IFP application. (Cox, Dwayne)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Valentino Mosquera. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cox, Dwayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mosquera v. Nassau Health Care Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Montero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nassau County Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Donna Henig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nassau Health Care Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Michel Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raybrook F.C.I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nassau County Correctional Sherrif Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valentino Mosquera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?