A.W.S. et al v. Southampton Union Free School District

Plaintiff: A.W.S., Jonathan K. Smith and Kayla Looking Horse
Defendant: Southampton Union Free School District
Case Number: 2:2019cv00889
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denis R Hurley
Referring Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1401
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Initial Conference ORDER: If counsel cannot agree to the proposed schedule or minor modifications thereof, as attached, they are directed to appear before the undersigned in Courtroom 810, United States Federal Courthouse, Central Islip, New York at the date and time provided in the initial conference order. See attachments for details.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 4/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order) c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER re #17 : The telephone conference on April 8, 2019 is hereby cancelled. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 4/4/2019. (Bochner, Francesca)
April 4, 2019 Filing 17 Letter withdrawing request for pre-motion conference (Doc. 15) by A.W.S., Kayla Looking Horse, Jonathan K. Smith (Moore, Scott)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER finding as moot #11 : Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 4/3/2019. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: re #15 A telephone conference will be held in this matter on Monday, April 8, 2019 at 11:00 AM to discuss Plaintiffs' request for a pre-motion conference for a proposed motion to strike. Plaintiffs' counsel will initiate the call and counsel for both sides shall be on the line before calling Chambers at (631) 712-5650. In the event counsel is unavailable at the scheduled time, s/he shall consult with opposing counsel and provide two alternate dates and/or times by letter filed on ECF on or before April 5, 2019. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 4/3/2019. (Bochner, Francesca)
April 2, 2019 Filing 15 Letter request for pre-motion conference to strike the Answer filed by Defendant and for entry of default by A.W.S., Kayla Looking Horse, Jonathan K. Smith (Moore, Scott)
April 1, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY in Support re #12 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by Southampton Union Free School District. (Gasser, Christine)
April 1, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Southampton Union Free School District. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Gasser, Christine)
April 1, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, and Cross Motion to Direct Clerk's Entry of Default filed by A.W.S., Kayla Looking Horse, Jonathan K. Smith. (Moore, Scott)
March 29, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, by Southampton Union Free School District. (Gasser, Christine)
March 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Gasser on behalf of Southampton Union Free School District (aty to be noticed) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Gasser, Christine)
March 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer S. Heitman on behalf of Southampton Union Free School District (aty to be noticed) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Heitman, Jennifer)
March 28, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Certificate of Default by A.W.S., Kayla Looking Horse, Jonathan K. Smith (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Scott M. Moore in Support of Application, #2 Exhibit Return of Service, #3 Exhibit Proposed Certificate of Default) (Moore, Scott)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER re #7 : The time for Southampton Union Free School District is extended to and including March 25, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 3/19/2019. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
March 15, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or motion in response to Summons and Complaint by Southampton Union Free School District. (Arntsen, David)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by A.W.S., Jonathan K. Smith, Kayla Looking Horse. Southampton Union Free School District served on 2/20/2019, answer due 3/13/2019. (Moore, Scott)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Southampton Union Free School District. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 14, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by A.W.S., Kayla Looking Horse, Jonathan K. Smith (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (Moore, Scott)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Southampton Union Free School District filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11199965 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by A.W.S., Jonathan K. Smith, Kayla Looking Horse. (Moore, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.W.S. et al v. Southampton Union Free School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.W.S.
Represented By: Scott M. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan K. Smith
Represented By: Scott M. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Looking Horse
Represented By: Scott M. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southampton Union Free School District
Represented By: Christine Gasser
Represented By: Jennifer S. Heitman
Represented By: David H. Arntsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?